Huskisson v. Walmart Inc.
Plaintiff: Rosalie Huskisson
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01293
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Referring Judge: Michael M Mihm
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Compliance. (Van Court, Rebecca)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: This case is set for a Rule 16 scheduling conference before Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 11/22/2019 at 10:30 AM via telephone (Court to set up the call). If Counsel are to be reached at a number different than what is listed on the docket sheet, they are directed to phone Judge Hawley's courtroom deputy at 309-671-7117 and confirm the phone number where they may be reached for the call. A discovery plan pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f)(3) shall be filed on or before 11/19/2019. The parties may, but are not required to, follow the format of the sample discovery plan set forth as Attachment A to the standing order attached to this text order. The Discovery Plan event may be found in the CM/ECF system within the other Documents category. All counsel must read and be familiar with the standing order attached to this text order prior to their Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 10/17/2019. (WG, ilcd)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 10/16/2019. IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiff's Motion to Remand #6 is DENIED. This case is referred to the Magistrate Judge for further scheduling. SEE FULL WRITTEN ORDER. (JRK, ilcd)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Remand filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Van Court, Rebecca)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand by Plaintiff Rosalie Huskisson. Responses due by 9/30/2019 (Molchin, Chase)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Nicholas Clark Martin on behalf of Walmart Inc. (Martin, Nicholas)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Walmart Inc.. (Van Court, Rebecca)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Walmart Inc.. (Van Court, Rebecca)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Rebecca L Van Court on behalf of Walmart Inc. (Van Court, Rebecca)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from McLean County, case number 19-L-42 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3186836), filed by Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Complaint, #6 Entry of Appearance, #7 Answer, #8 Answer to Affirmative Defenses, #9 Notice of Filing)(Van Court, Rebecca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huskisson v. Walmart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas Clark Martin
Represented By: Rebecca L Van Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalie Huskisson
Represented By: Chase Thomas Molchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?