Clark v. Entzel
Petitioner: Michael Anthony Clark
Respondent: Frederick Entzel
Case Number: 1:2019cv01305
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: James E Shadid
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Filing 10 Letter to Petitioner Michael Anthony Clark regarding cost for copies. (FDS, ilcd)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 10/16/19. Petitioner has filed a Motion #9 seeking a file stamped copy of his 112-page Memorandum of Law and inquiring as to why he did not receive one yet. Pursuant to CDIL-LR 16.3(B)(3), "All requests for file-stamped copies of documents must be accompanied by a stamped, self-addressed envelope and an extra copy to be file-stamped and returned." Because Petitioner did not send a stamped, self-addressed envelope, the Clerk's office was not required to send him a file-stamped copy of this document. Petitioner's Motion #9 is DENIED. If Petitioner would now like a copy of his Memorandum of Law #2 , he may order a copy from the Clerk's Office. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send Petitioner information on the costs for obtaining a copy of his Memorandum of Law #2 . (FDS, ilcd)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 10/16/19. Petitioner has filed a Motion to Request Counsel #3 . Civil litigants have no constitutional or statutory right to counsel. Zarnes v. Rhodes, 64 F.3d 285, 288 (7th Cir. 1995). When confronted with a motion to appoint counsel, the court should ask whether the Petitioner has made efforts to obtain counsel and whether the Petitioner appears competent to litigate the case himself. Pruitt v. Mote, 503 F.3d 647, 654 (7th Cir. 2007). Here, Petitioner has not indicated that he has made any efforts to obtain counsel. Petitioner's Petition has clearly presented his arguments and there is nothing before the Court to suggest that he is not capable of adequately presenting his case at this time. Also, Petitioner has not stated that he suffers from any mental or physical disability that would impair his ability to represent himself. Overall, Petitioner appears quite competent to represent himself and do the necessary legal research and advance his claims on his own. Accordingly, Petitioners Motion #3 is DENIED at this time. (FDS, ilcd)
October 15, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for copies (112 pages of Memorandum of Law) by Petitioner Michael Anthony Clark. Responses due by 10/29/2019 (FDS, ilcd)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 10/9/2019. Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time To File Response #8 is GRANTED. Respondent shall file his response on or before December 2, 2019. Petitioner may file a reply on or before December 23, 2019.(RK, ilcd)
October 9, 2019 Filing 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Respondent Frederick Entzel. Responses due by 10/23/2019 (Walters, Greggory)
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed upon Warden of FCI Pekin as to #6 Order. (RK, ilcd)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 10/2/2019. The Court orders Respondent to file an answer, motion, or other response re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, within twenty-one (21) days after service of this Order. (Show Cause Response due by 10/23/2019.) See full Order attached. (RK, ilcd)
October 1, 2019 Filing fee: $5.00, receipt number 14626035367. (VH, ilcd)
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from Michael Anthony Clark regarding the filing fee. (RK, ilcd)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 9/23/2019. Petitioner has filed a Petition for Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. Petitioners Petition states that the $5 filing fee was included in the filing, but it was not. Petitioner is directed to either pay the $5 filing fee or provide the Court with a signed Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs that also includes a copy of his trust fund ledger, certified by the appropriate institutional officer, showing all receipts, expenditures and balances for the last six months. Petitioner shall do so on or before October 21, 2019, or the Court will dismiss the case without prejudice for failure to pay the filing fee. The Clerk is directed to send Petitioner a copy of the forms for proceeding in forma pauperis.(RK, ilcd)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Michael Anthony Clark. (RK, ilcd)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Request Counsel by Petitioner Michael Anthony Clark. Responses due by 9/30/2019 (RK, ilcd)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) filed by Petitioner Michael Anthony Clark. (RK, ilcd)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. 2241, filed by Michael Anthony Clark.(RK, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. Entzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Anthony Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Frederick Entzel
Represented By: Greggory R Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?