Muhammad v. Entzel
Petitioner: Kaba Shabazz Muhammad
Respondent: Entzel
Case Number: 1:2019cv01343
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara Darrow
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 12/4/2019. Respondents Motion for Extension of Time to File Response (d/e #3 ) is GRANTED. Respondents response to Petitioners Petition (d/e #1 ) is now due on or before January 6, 2020. Petitioner may file a reply on or before January 27, 2020. Respondents duplicate Motion (d/e #4 ) is DISMISSED AS MOOT. (ED, ilcd)
December 2, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Respondent Entzel. Responses due by 12/16/2019 (Walters, Greggory)
December 2, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Respondent Entzel. Responses due by 12/16/2019 (Walters, Greggory)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 11/18/2019. See written Order. The Court has reviewed the Petition pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2243, 2241, and Rule 4 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Proceedings for the United States District Courts, and ORDERS Respondent to file an answer, motion, or other response, within twenty-one (21) days after service of this Order. After Respondent has filed his response, Petitioner is ORDERED to file any traverse or reply to Respondents response within twenty-one (21) days after service of said response on him.(ED, ilcd)
November 14, 2019 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 14626035676 (FDS, ilcd)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 10/29/2019. Petitioner has filed a Petition for Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. Petitioner is directed to either pay the $5 filing fee or provide the Court with a signed Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs that also includes a copy of his trust fund ledger, certified by the appropriate institutional officer, showing all receipts, expenditures and balances for the last six months. Petitioner shall do so on or before November 29, 2019, or the Court will dismiss the case without prejudice for failure to pay the filing fee. The Clerk is directed to send Petitioner a copy of the forms for proceeding in forma pauperis. (ED, ilcd)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Kaba Shabazz Muhammad. (Attachments: #1 letter)(ED, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muhammad v. Entzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kaba Shabazz Muhammad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Entzel
Represented By: Greggory R Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?