Johnson v. Hudson
Petitioner: Eric Lamont Johnson
Respondent: Hudson
Case Number: 1:2019cv01346
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sue E Myerscough
Referring Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Remark: Case transferred from Illinois Central has been opened in Northern District of Illinois - CM/ECF LIVE, Ver 6.3.1 as case 1:19-cv-07217, filed 11/01/2019. (ME, ilcd)
October 31, 2019 Case transferred to the Northern District of Illinois. Case was electronically submitted to the transferee court. (MJC, ilcd)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: This Case is TRANSFERRED in the interests of justice to the District Court for the Northern District of Illinois. The Court also notes that Petitioner has not paid the $5.00 filing fee or filed a Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. However, the Court will leave this issue for the receiving court. SEE WRITTEN ORDER. Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 10/30/2019. (MJC, ilcd)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Eric Lamont Johnson. (MJC, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eric Lamont Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?