Lloyd v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Mario Howard Lloyd
Defendant: . Ioeger and United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv01348
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: United States of America answer due 2/25/2020. (KE, ilcd)
December 27, 2019 Filing 13 Return of Service Executed by Mario Howard Lloyd as to United States of America 12/23/2019. (KE, ilcd)
December 27, 2019 Filing 12 Mail Returned as Undeliverable, re #8 . Mail sent to Ioeger. (KE, ilcd)
December 23, 2019 Filing 11 Return of Service Executed by Mario Howard Lloyd as to United States of America 12/19/2019. (TC, ilcd)
December 17, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to. Ioeger, United States of America. (KE, ilcd)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 HIPAA QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 12/17/2019. See written order.(KE, ilcd)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MERIT REVIEW ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 12/17/2019. Pursuant to its merit review of the Complaint under 28 U.S.C. Sec 1915A, the Court finds that the Complaint states two claims: (1) a claim under the Federal Tort Claims Act against the United States of America and (2) an excessive force claim under Bivens against Mr.Ioeger. Any additional claims shall not be included in the case except at the Court's discretion and on a motion by a party for good cause shown or pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send, by certified mail, a summons, a copy of Plaintiff's Complaint, and a copy of this Order to the United States Attorney for the Central District of Illinois and to the Attorney General of the United States in Washington, D.C., pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i). The Clerk of the Court is further directed to send, by certified mail, a summons, a copy of Plaintiff's Complaint, and a copy of this Order to Mr. Ioeger at FCI Pekin. Id. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter the standard qualified protective order pursuant to the Health Insurance Portability and Accountability Act. Rule 16 Deadline 2/15/2020. See written order. (KE, ilcd)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #3 Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 12/9/2019. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $40.50. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to forward the initial partial filing fee from Plaintiff`s account to the Clerk of Court. After payment of the initial partial filing fee (or immediately if no funds are available for that payment) the agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month`s income credited to Plaintiff`s account to the Clerk of Court. Income includes all deposits from any source. The agency having custody of the plaintiff shall forward these payments each time Plaintiff`s account exceeds $10, until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff`s place of confinement, to the attention of the Trust Fund Office. (KE, ilcd)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 11/1/2019. Plaintiff's motion to add exhibit #5 is GRANTED, and the exhibit referenced by Plaintiff will be considered a part of his Complaint. (SAG, ilcd)
October 31, 2019 Filing 7 Letter from Clerk of the Court requesting Trust Fund Ledgers. (KE, ilcd)
October 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE to the Court regarding current address. (KE, ilcd)
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Add Exhibit to Complaint by Plaintiff Mario Howard Lloyd. Responses due by 11/12/2019 (KE, ilcd)
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Mario Howard Lloyd. (KE, ilcd)
October 29, 2019 Filing 3 PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Mario Howard Lloyd.(KE, ilcd)
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Colin Stirling Bruce. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Urbana Division, 201 S Vine Street, Urbana, IL 61802.Merit Review Deadline set for 11/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(KE, ilcd)
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Mario Howard Lloyd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope)(KE, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lloyd v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Howard Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Ioeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?