Williams v. Fatheree
Petitioner: Demarius Williams
Respondent: Jon Fatheree
Not Yet Classified: Habeas Attorney General
Case Number: 1:2019cv01359
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Jason F Krigel on behalf of Jon Fatheree (Krigel, Jason)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 11/22/19. Respondent, Jon Fatheree, has sixty (60) days to file a response to the Petition pursuant to Rule 5 of the Rules Governing Section 2254. SEE WRITTEN ORDER. ( Responses due by 1/21/2020) (SKR, ilcd)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Request Counsel by Petitioner Demarius Williams. Responses due by 11/18/2019 (SKR, ilcd)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5 Receipt number 14626035612.) filed by Demarius Williams. (Attachments: #1 exhibits, #2 envelope)(SKR, ilcd) Modified on 11/5/2019 to add receipt number(SKR, ilcd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Fatheree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Habeas Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jon Fatheree
Represented By: Jason F Krigel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Demarius Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?