Regan v. Peace et al
Plaintiff: Deshawn Regan
Defendant: . Tracy, Gish, Peace, Teri Kennady and Lawrence
Case Number: 1:2019cv01362
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sue E Myerscough
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 10 Letter from Clerk of the Court requesting Trust Fund Ledgers. (KE, ilcd)
November 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Sue E Myerscough. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Springfield Division, 600 E Monroe, Springfield,IL 62701.Merit Review Deadline set for 11/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(KE, ilcd)
November 7, 2019 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-06487. .
November 6, 2019 Filing 7 TRANSFERRED to the Central District of Illinois at Urbana the electronic record. (aee, )
October 17, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (aee, )
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This action is transferred to the United States District Court for the Central District of Illinois at Urbana for imposition of an initial filing fee and whatever other action the transferee court deems appropriate. The Clerk shall not issue summonses unless the transferee court so directs. The case and all pending motions are terminated on this Court's docket. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 10/17/2019. Mailed notice (aee, )
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM by Deshawn Regan in support of motion for attorney representation #4 . (smm, )
September 27, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Deshawn Regan for attorney representation. (smm, )
September 27, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION and Financial Affidavit by Plaintiff Deshawn Regan for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (smm, )
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet. (smm, )
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and 4 copies by Deshawn Regan. (Envelope postmark 9/24/19; institution mail room not postmarked). (smm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Regan v. Peace et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Tracy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teri Kennady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deshawn Regan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?