Grant II v. Central Intelligence Agency et al
Plaintiff: William Lee Grant II and William Lee Grant, II
Defendant: Special Collection Service and Central Intelligence Agency
Case Number: 1:2019cv01375
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Office: Peoria Office
Presiding Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Referring Judge: James E Shadid
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Filing 6 JUDGMENT entered. (VH, ilcd)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER denying Plaintiff's Motion #3 for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's complaint is frivolous. See In the Matter of William Lee Grant II, No. 19-mc-03002-JBM-EIL (C.D. Ill. Feb. 12, 2019). This action is dismissed with prejudice. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i). This Order also provides notice to Plaintiff that the Court will treat future cases transferred into this District as "removed" cases for the purposes of enforcing paragraph 4 of the sanction order in 19-mc-03002. The Clerk is directed to close the case. Entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 11/26/2019. (SJP, ilcd)
November 21, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of New Mexico; Case Number 1:19-cv-01077. .
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter Transferring Venue to the Central District of Illinois. (plp)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by William Lee Grant II. (nr)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Central Intelligence Agency, Special Collection Service, filed by William Lee Grant II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(nr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grant II v. Central Intelligence Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Lee Grant II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Lee Grant, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Special Collection Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Intelligence Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?