Mosley v. General Revenue Corporation
Plaintiff: Bonnie Mosley
Defendant: General Revenue Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv01012
Filed: January 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Referring Judge: James E Shadid
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #5 Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Responsive Pleading. Defendant General Revenue Corporation shall file their responsive pleading by 3/9/2020. This is the final extension granted for the defendant and no further extensions of time will be granted absent a showing of extraordinary circumstances. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 3/2/2020. (WG, ilcd)
February 29, 2020 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by Defendant General Revenue Corporation. (Murphy, Christopher)
February 28, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Bonnie Mosley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kuyper, Theodore)
February 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Theodore H Kuyper on behalf of Bonnie Mosley (Kuyper, Theodore)
February 28, 2020 Filing 5 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Defendant General Revenue Corporation. Responses due by 3/13/2020 (Murphy, Christopher)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive pleading. General Revenue Corporation deadline extended to 3/2/2020. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 2/3/2020. (WG, ilcd)
January 31, 2020 Filing 4 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Defendant General Revenue Corporation. Responses due by 2/14/2020 (Murphy, Christopher)
January 31, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Christopher R Murphy on behalf of General Revenue Corporation (Murphy, Christopher)
January 8, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to General Revenue Corporation. (JS, ilcd)
January 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against General Revenue Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3276903.), filed by Bonnie Mosley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to General Revenue Corp.)(Keogh, Keith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mosley v. General Revenue Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Mosley
Represented By: Keith James Keogh
Represented By: Theodore H Kuyper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Revenue Corporation
Represented By: Christopher R Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?