Marquis ProCap System, LLC v. Novozymes North America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Marquis ProCap System, LLC
Defendant: Novozymes North America, Inc. and Green Plains, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01020
Filed: January 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Referring Judge: Michael M Mihm
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction: Responses due by 4/3/2020 OR Status Report due by 4/3/2020. (JRK, ilcd)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: On 3/2/2020, this Court entered a Text Order advising Plaintiff that no further extensions of time would be granted but for extraordinary circumstances. In #37 Plaintiff's Fourth Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant Green Plains, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss, Plaintiff indicates that ongoing settlement discussions have been taking place, and as a result, Defendant Green Plains, Inc. has no objection to an extension. In light of the recent and ongoing settlement discussions, the Court will GRANT #37 Plaintiff's Fourth Motion For Extension of Time to File Response. If settlement does not occur, Plaintiff must file its response on or before April 3, 2020. Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 3/6/2020. (NRL, ilcd)
March 5, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Agreed Motion) by Plaintiff Marquis ProCap System, LLC. Responses due by 3/19/2020 (Gekas, John)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: The Court has reviewed Plaintiff's #36 Third Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant Green Plains, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss #24 . This is Plaintiff's third motion with each request being a week apart. The frequency of requests is concerning to the Court. Because Plaintiff's Motion indicates that Defendant has no objection, the Court will GRANT Plaintiff's Third Motion for Extension of Time. No further extensions of time will be granted but for extraordinary circumstances. Plaintiff must file their response on or before March 6, 2020. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 3/2/2020. (KZ, ilcd) Modified on 3/3/2020 to correct document number for Motion to Dismiss from 32 to 24. (JRK, ilcd).
February 28, 2020 Filing 36 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Green Plains, Inc. Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Marquis ProCap System, LLC. Responses due by 3/6/2020 (Gekas, John)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley granting #35 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. Response due by 2/28/2020. Additionally, the response date for Green Plains' response to First and Second set of Requests for admission are stayed.Entered on 2/21/20. (WG, ilcd)
February 21, 2020 Filing 35 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Green Plains, Inc. Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Marquis ProCap System, LLC. Responses due by 2/28/2020 (Gekas, John)
February 20, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by John J Cotter on behalf of Novozymes North America, Inc. (Cotter, John)
February 20, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by John J Cotter on behalf of Novozymes North America, Inc. (Cotter, John)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER: With the agreement of the parties, the Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for Monday, May 18, 2020 at 9:00 AM is RESET for Wednesday, July 22, 2020 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom B in Peoria before Judge Michael M. Mihm. The Court has reserved three days for the hearing. Any issues/disputes should be brought to the attention of the Court immediately. Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 2/14/2020. (MNS, ilcd)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: The Court has reviewed Plaintiffs Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant Green Plains, Inc.s Motion to Dismiss #32 . Plaintiffs Motion indicates that Defendant has no objection. Therefore, Plaintiffs Motion for Extension of Time #32 is GRANTED. Plaintiff must file their response on or before February 21, 2020. Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 2/14/2020. (NRL, ilcd)
February 14, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Green Plains, Inc. Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Marquis ProCap System, LLC. Responses due by 2/21/2020 (Gekas, John)
February 12, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Edward J Mikolinski on behalf of Novozymes North America, Inc. (Mikolinski, Edward)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER. The Joint Motion for Entry of Confidentiality Order #29 is granted. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 2/7/2020. (KZ, ilcd)
February 6, 2020 Filing 29 Joint MOTION for Entry of Confidentiality Order by Plaintiff Marquis ProCap System, LLC. Responses due by 2/20/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (proposed confidentiality order))(Jacobson, Michael)
February 5, 2020 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Novozymes North America, Inc.. (Houston, Matthew)
February 5, 2020 Filing 27 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Novozymes North America, Inc..(Houston, Matthew)
February 5, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Matthew Thomas Houston on behalf of Novozymes North America, Inc. (Houston, Matthew)
January 31, 2020 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM re #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Green Plains, Inc.. (Glenn, Ryann)
January 31, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Defendant Green Plains, Inc.. Responses due by 2/14/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Todd Becker in support of Motion to Dismiss)(Glenn, Ryann)
January 29, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Ryann Ashley Glenn on behalf of Green Plains, Inc. (Glenn, Ryann)
January 23, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Michael Ross Annis on behalf of Green Plains, Inc. (Annis, Michael)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley: As the Clerk's office has addressed the attorney admission for Tricia M. Kazinetz and John F. Stoviak, the Court finds #20 and #21 Motions for Leave to File as Moot. Entered on 1/22/2020. (WG, ilcd)
January 22, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to File Seeking Tricia M. Kazinetz to Participate in a Case by Plaintiff Marquis ProCap System, LLC. (Gekas, John)
January 22, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to File Seeking John F. Stoviak to Participate in a Case by Plaintiff Marquis ProCap System, LLC. (Gekas, John)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 1/16/2020. See full written Order.(VH, ilcd)
January 16, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Joseph C Wylie, II on behalf of Novozymes North America, Inc. (Wylie, Joseph)
January 16, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of CORRECTED Proposed Agreed Order (Gekas, John)
January 16, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Proposed Agreed Order (Gekas, John)
January 15, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael M. Mihm: : Parties present via telephone by Attorneys Michael Jacobson, John Gekas, John Stoviak, Joseph Wylie, Lee Hogewood, John Cotter, Michael Annis and Ryann Glenn for Motion Hearing held on 1/16/2020. Discussion held re #5 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Rule to Show Cause filed by Marquis ProCap System, LLC and #6 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Rule to Show Cause Memorandum In Support filed by Marquis ProCap System, LLC. Counsel represents to the court that an agreement has been reached on the pending Emergency Motions for Temporary Restraining Orders. Counsel to submit a proposed order to the Court. Counsel represents that the proposed order will also address #10 Motion to Expediate Discovery. Case is set for a Preliminary Injunction Hearing on 5/18/2020 at 9:00AM in Courtroom B in Peoria before U.S. District Judge Michael M. Mihm. The court has reserved the week for this hearing. Any issues/disputes should be brought to the attention of the Court immediately. The Court directs parties to contact U.S. Magistrate Jonathan E. Hawley's chambers should they desire a settlement conference. The Court also directs any counsel that is not admitted in the Central District of Illinois to do so promptly. (Court Reporter JJ.) (JS, ilcd)
January 15, 2020 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint for Emergency Injunctive Relief with Exhibits served on Novozymes North America, Inc. c/o Registered Agent CT Corporation System on January 15, 2020, filed by Marquis ProCap System, LLC. (Gekas, John)
January 15, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Pursuant to #14 Summons Returned Executed as to Defendant Green Plains, Inc., answer is due 2/4/2020. (JRK, ilcd)
January 14, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint for Emergency Injunctive Relief with Exhibits served on Green Plains, Inc. c/o Registered Agent CT Corporation System on January 14, 2020, filed by Marquis ProCap System, LLC. (Gekas, John) Modified on 1/15/2020 to clarify entry (JRK, ilcd).
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER: A Motion Hearing on Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Rule to Show Cause #5 is set for Wednesday, January 1/15/2020 at 3:00 PM by telephone from Peoria (court will place call) before Judge Michael M. Mihm. Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 1/14/2020. (MNS, ilcd)
January 14, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE Updated Certificate Pursuant to Rule 65(b)(1)(B). (Gekas, John)
January 14, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65(b)(1)(B). (Gekas, John)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Plaintiff Marquis ProCap System, LLC requests leave to file declarations in support of its #5 Emergency Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order under seal. Plaintiff argues that the declarations refer to and incorporate documents and information designated as proprietary and confidential. The Court finds compelling interests exist to file these documents under seal. Therefore, Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal is GRANTED and documents #8 and #9 are to remain sealed. Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 1/14/2020. (NRL, ilcd)
January 14, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Green Plains, Inc., Novozymes North America, Inc. (RK, ilcd)
January 14, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Plaintiff Marquis ProCap System, LLC. Responses due by 1/28/2020 (Gekas, John)
January 14, 2020 Filing 9 +++ SEALED DOCUMENT.. (Gekas, John)
January 14, 2020 Filing 8 +++ SEALED DOCUMENT.. (Gekas, John)
January 14, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal by Plaintiff Marquis ProCap System, LLC. Responses due by 1/28/2020 (Gekas, John)
January 14, 2020 Filing 6 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Rule to Show Cause Memorandum In Support by Plaintiff Marquis ProCap System, LLC. Responses due by 1/28/2020 (Gekas, John)
January 14, 2020 Filing 5 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Rule to Show Cause by Plaintiff Marquis ProCap System, LLC. Responses due by 1/28/2020 (Gekas, John)
January 14, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Michael Andrew Jacobson on behalf of Marquis ProCap System, LLC (Jacobson, Michael)
January 14, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Civil Cover Sheet (Gekas, John)
January 14, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by John C Gekas on behalf of Marquis ProCap System, LLC (Gekas, John)
January 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR EMERGENCY INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3280734.), filed by Marquis ProCap System, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Mutual Confidentiality Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2: Novozymes/Green Plains Announcement)(Gekas, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marquis ProCap System, LLC v. Novozymes North America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marquis ProCap System, LLC
Represented By: Michael A. Jacobson
Represented By: John C Gekas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novozymes North America, Inc.
Represented By: John J Cotter
Represented By: Edward J Mikolinski
Represented By: Joseph C Wylie, II
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Plains, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Ross Annis
Represented By: Ryann Ashley Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?