Waller et al v. Afni, Inc.
Plaintiff: Natalie Waller, Alexandria Barleycorn, Justin Racer and La'Quenza Frett
Defendant: Afni, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01080
Filed: February 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Referring Judge: James E Shadid
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consents to Join Wage Claim)(Stephan, Ryan)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 4/15/2020: The Consent to Join Wage Claim Form attached to the Plaintiff's Notice of Filing #17 contains an unredacted signature. The Clerk is therefore directed to place the Consent form under seal, and the Plaintiff is directed to file a redacted copy in compliance with Local Rule 5.11(A) by 4/16/2020. (TK, ilcd)
April 14, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Filing Consents to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Samantha Denton)(Alexander, William)
April 8, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join Wage Claim Form)(Stephan, Ryan)
April 1, 2020 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Derrick Hackett on 3/9/2020, filed by Alexandria Barleycorn, La'Quenza Frett, Justin Racer, Natalie Waller. (Stephan, Ryan)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER: This case is set for a Rule 16 scheduling conference before Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 5/1/20 at 10:00 AM via telephone (Court to set up the call). If Counsel are to be reached at a number different than what is listed on the docket sheet, they are directed to phone Judge Hawley's courtroom deputy at 309-671-7117 and confirm the phone number where they may be reached for the call. A discovery plan pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f)(3) shall be filed on or before 4/28/20. The parties may, but are not required to, follow the format of the sample discovery plan set forth as Attachment A to the standing order attached to this text order. The Discovery Plan event may be found in the CM/ECF system within the other Documents category. All counsel must read and be familiar with the standing order attached to this text order prior to their Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 3/30/2020. (WG, ilcd)
March 29, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Christopher John Jump on behalf of Afni, Inc. (Jump, Christopher)
March 29, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Richard A Russo on behalf of Afni, Inc. (Russo, Richard)
March 29, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Afni, Inc.. (Clark, Abby)
March 29, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Afni, Inc..(Clark, Abby)
March 27, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consents to Join Wage Claim, #2 Exhibit Consents to Join Wage Claim)(Stephan, Ryan)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Attorney Austin W. Anderson and granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Attorney William Clifton Alexander. The Clerk is directed to STRIKE the Motions for Admission to Practice [8-1], [9-1] attached to the Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Those Motions for Admission must be submitted with a $231.00 application fee via the Online Attorney Admission Program found on the U.S. District Court for the Central District of Illinois's website: https://ecf.ilcd.uscourts.gov/atty_reg/index.html. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 3/25/2020. (KZ, ilcd)
March 24, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Plaintiffs Alexandria Barleycorn, La'Quenza Frett, Justin Racer, Natalie Waller. Responses due by 4/7/2020 (Attachments STRICKEN PURSUANT TO TEXT ORDER ENTERED 3/25/2020: #1 Exhibit Motion for Admission)(Stephan, Ryan) Modified on 3/26/2020 (JRK, ilcd).
March 24, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Plaintiffs Alexandria Barleycorn, La'Quenza Frett, Justin Racer, Natalie Waller. Responses due by 4/7/2020 (Attachments STRICKEN PURSUANT TO TEXT ORDER ENTERED 3/25/2020: : #1 Exhibit Motion for Admission)(Stephan, Ryan) Modified on 3/26/2020 (JRK, ilcd).
March 17, 2020 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Plaintiffs Alexandria Barleycorn, La'Quenza Frett, Justin Racer, Natalie Waller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 to 15)(Stephan, Ryan)
March 17, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Certify Class by Plaintiffs Alexandria Barleycorn, La'Quenza Frett, Justin Racer, Natalie Waller. Responses due by 3/31/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Stephan, Ryan)
March 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consents to Join Wage Claim Forms)(Stephan, Ryan)
February 28, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consents to Join Wage Claim)(Stephan, Ryan)
February 28, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Afni, Inc. (FDS, ilcd)
February 27, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE Civil Cover Sheet (Stephan, Ryan)
February 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3317838.), filed by Natalie Waller, La'Quenza Frett, Alexandria Barleycorn, Justin Racer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A to D)(Stephan, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waller et al v. Afni, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalie Waller
Represented By: Ryan F Stephan
Represented By: James B Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandria Barleycorn
Represented By: Ryan F Stephan
Represented By: James B Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Racer
Represented By: Ryan F Stephan
Represented By: James B Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: La'Quenza Frett
Represented By: Ryan F Stephan
Represented By: James B Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Afni, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher John Jump
Represented By: Abby J Clark
Represented By: Richard A Russo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?