Poore et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Melody Poore and Ronald Poore
Defendant: Ethicon Inc and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 1:2020cv01089
Filed: March 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara Darrow
Referring Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 TEXT ORDER: This case is set for a Rule 16 scheduling conference before Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 5/29/20 at 10:15 AM via telephone. Counsel are to phone into conference by calling 571-353-2300, then enter 287753270#. Please announce your name each time prior to speaking unless the judge asks a question directly to you so that the speaker may be identified by all. A discovery plan pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f)(3) shall be filed on or before 5/26/20. The parties may, but are not required to, follow the format of the sample discovery plan set forth as Attachment A to the standing order attached to this text order. The Discovery Plan event may be found in the CM/ECF system within the other Documents category. All counsel must read and be familiar with the standing order attached to this text order prior to their Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 4/21/2020. (WG, ilcd)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #41 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michelle L Tiger terminated as counsel in this case. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 3/30/20. (WG, ilcd)
March 27, 2020 Filing 41 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Michelle Tiger by Plaintiffs Melody Poore, Ronald Poore. Responses due by 4/10/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gomez, Christopher)
March 27, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Christopher A Gomez on behalf of Melody Poore, Ronald Poore (Gomez, Christopher)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #39 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorneys Kari L Sutherland, William M Gage, Christy D Jones, David B. Thomas, Daniel R. Higginbotham and Susan M. Robinson terminated as counsel in this matter. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 3/24/20. (WG, ilcd) Modified on 3/31/2020 to include attorneys from both the law firms Butler Snow and Thomas, Combs & Spann (LN, ilcd).
March 23, 2020 Filing 39 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Motion to Withdrawal Attorneys from Butler Snow and Thomas, Combs & Spann. Attorney Jennifer L. Steinmetz from Tucker Ellis, LLP will continue to represent defendants by Defendants Ethicon Inc, Johnson & Johnson. Responses due by 4/6/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Steinmetz, Jennifer)
March 23, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Jennifer L Steinmetz on behalf of Ethicon Inc, Johnson & Johnson (Steinmetz, Jennifer)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on March 13, 2020. The #16 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is GRANTED. The following Counts remain: I (in part), V, X, XIII, XIV (in part), XVI, XVII, and XVIII.(GS, ilcd)
March 10, 2020 Filing 36 COMPLAINT filed by Ronald Poore, Melody Poore.(ED, ilcd)
March 10, 2020 Filing 35 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:15-cv-03182. .
March 3, 2020 Filing 34 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #24 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2039) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2042) - Pls' Mem in Supp of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2187) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2247) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2455) Part 1 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2455) Part 2 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2458) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2553) Part 1 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2553) Part 2 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2553) Part 3 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2621) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2839) Part 1 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2839) Part 2 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (2841) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (2957) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (3037) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (6857) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (6972) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (7113) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 3/4/2020 to add party filers) (msa).
March 3, 2020 Filing 33 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #24 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (4868) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Terry Colgan, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (4870) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Terry Colgan, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (4949) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Terry Colgan, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (6791) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Terry Colgan, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (7013) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Terry Colgan)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 3/4/2020 to add party filers) (msa).
March 3, 2020 Filing 32 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #24 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2060) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2065) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2134) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2232) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2910) - Defs' Supp Resp and Notice of Adoption of Resp Regarding Timothy Ulatowski, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (6860) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (6965) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (7143) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 3/4/2020 to add party filers) (msa).
March 3, 2020 Filing 31 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #24 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2479) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Larry Sirls, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2480) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Larry Sirls, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2936) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Larry Sirls, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (3288) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Larry Sirls, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (6855) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Larry Sirls, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (6997) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Larry Sirls, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (7142) - Notice of Adotpion of Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Larry Sirls)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 3/4/2020 to add party filers) (msa).
March 3, 2020 Filing 30 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #24 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (3610) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Elizabeth Mueller, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (3612) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Elizabeth Mueller, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (3757) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Elizabeth Mueller, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (3848) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Elizabeth Mueller, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (6826) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Elizabeth Mueller, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (6981) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Elizabeth Mueller, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (7102) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Elizabeth Mueller)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 3/4/2020 to add party filers) (msa).
March 3, 2020 Filing 29 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #24 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2759) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2760) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2949) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (3017) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (6821) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (6958) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (7177) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 3/4/2020 to add party filers)(msa).
March 3, 2020 Filing 28 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #24 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (3619) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (3619) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (3619) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (3621) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 1 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 2 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 3 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3865) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (6874) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (6874) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (6874) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (6875) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (7038) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (7045) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (7085) - Amended Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (7183) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 3/4/2020 to add party filers) (msa).
March 3, 2020 Filing 27 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #24 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (3626) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (3626) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (3630) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 1 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 2 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 3 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 4 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3855) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (6648) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (6833) - Amended Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (6926) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (7123) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 3/4/2020 to add party filers) (msa).
March 3, 2020 Filing 26 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #24 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2047) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2817) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2818) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2931) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (3024) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (5332) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (5333) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (5482) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (5548) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (6852) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (6960) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 3/4/2020 to add party filers) (msa).
March 3, 2020 Filing 25 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #24 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2029) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Michael Margolis, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2031) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Michael Margolis, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2169) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Michael Margolis, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2212) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Michael Margolis, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2832) - Defs' Supp Mot to Exclude Michael Margolis and Notice of Adoption, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2833) - Defs' Mem in Support of Supp Mot to Exclude Michael Margolis and Notice of Adoption, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2904) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Supp Mot to Exclude Michael Margolis and Notice of Adoption, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (6868) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot and Reply to Exclude Michael Margolis, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (6953) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Michael Margolis)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 3/4/2020 to add party filers) (msa).
March 3, 2020 Filing 24 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL ECF (238) - First Amended Master Long Form Complaint, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (239) - Master Answer of Ethicon, Inc. to First Amended Master Complaint, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (241) - Master Answer of Johnson & Johnson to First Amended Master Complaint, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (262) - Short Form Complaint, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (263) - Amended Short Form Complaint)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 3/4/2020 to add party filers)(msa).
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A It is DIRECTED that on 03/06/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 03/05/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 02/21/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (kew)
April 24, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Gage, William)
April 23, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Melody Poore, Ronald Poore (Balefsky, Lee)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SHOW CAUSE ORDER directing that plaintiffs' leadership and counsel for ALL defendants named in cases on Exhibit 1 are directed to show cause in writing why they should not be sanctioned for failing to comply with the Order entered in MDL 2327 at ECF #7710 by Wednesday 4/24/2019; any filing must be made in the individual cases on Exhibit 1; the court will schedule a hearing at a later date. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/10/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit 1) (mwk) (ADI)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER The court ORDERS that by 4/8/2019 plaintiffs' leadership and counsel for ALL defendants with cases identified on Exhibit A attached hereto are directed to go to the court's website at https://www.wvsd.uscourts.gov/MDL/ethicon/forms.html, complete and jointly submit one copy of the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet in Excel format as found on the court's website to the court at WVSDml_MDL_Transfers@wvsd.uscourts.gov; the parties shall use the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet on the court's website, as it is already partially completed; if the court's docket sheet for any case on Exhibit A indicates that the case has closed prior to or after the entry of this order, the parties are directed to so indicate on the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet and need not complete the requested information on the Spreadsheet; the court cautions that many of these cases name other MDL defendants in addition to the Ethicon defendants; the court expects any necessary coordination from all defendants remaining in the cases on Exhibit A. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/26/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (mwk) (ADI)
October 25, 2018 Filing 18 OPPOSITION by Melody Poore and Ronald Poore to #16 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Balefsky, Lee) (Modified text on 10/26/2018) (slr).
October 11, 2018 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in support of #16 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Higginbotham, Daniel)
October 11, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachment: #1 Exhibits A - C)(Higginbotham, Daniel)
September 18, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITIONS by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Friends and Family: Melody Poore, Ronald Poore (husband), Bryan Huggins, Kristi Huggins, Dalton Huggins, Marsha Poore, Ronald Poore (father-in-law), Erika Burton on a Date to Be Determined (Robinson, Susan)
August 15, 2018 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case Specific Expert Witnesses and Defendants Non-Retained Expert Disclosures. (Gage, William)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRETRIAL ORDER # 303 (Amended Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 8 Cases) Because the court has determined there was confusion as to expert deadlines, changes have been made to Paragraph A of PTO # 280. The parties are advised that while this order will be entered in the individual cases in the coming days, it is effective as of the day it was entered in the main MDL. The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 8 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 03/19/2018; Defendant Fact Sheets due by 04/19/2018; Deadline for written discovery requests due by 05/18/2018; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 07/13/2018; Expert disclosure served by defendants pursuant to Fed R. Civ P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/13/2018; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/20/2018; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 10/04/2018; Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 10/18/2018; Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/25/2018; Reply to response to Dispositive motions due by 11/01/2018; Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/18/2018; Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/25/2018; and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 11/01/2018. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/13/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 8 Cases) (mek) (ADI)
June 8, 2018 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Melody Poore, Ronald Poore for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case-Specific Expert Witnesses. (Balefsky, Lee)
May 18, 2018 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc. for First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission and Requests for Production to Plaintiff. (Higginbotham, Daniel)
May 2, 2018 Filing 10 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Melody Poore on 5/8/18 at 9:00 a.m. (Robinson, Susan)
April 24, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Melody Poore on 5/8/18 at 9:00 a.m. (Robinson, Susan)
January 31, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. David D. Stuterman on 5/4/2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Thomas, David)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRETRIAL ORDER # 280 (Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 8 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING ETHICON, INC. CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 8 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. For any cases in the Ethicon, Inc. MDL with a Covidien Wave 1 flag, the stay on the flagged Covidien Wave 1 cases is lifted and the Covidien Wave 1 cases in the Ethicon MDL are incorporated in the Ethicon, Inc., Wave 8 cases and subject to this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 8 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 8 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 8 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (PMA)
October 6, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kari L. Sutherland on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Sutherland, Kari)
June 16, 2017 Filing 5 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Melody Poore, Ronald Poore. (Gomez, Christopher)
April 30, 2015 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy)
April 24, 2015 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David)
March 17, 2015 Filing 2 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 167 (QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER)entered on 02/26/2015 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (kw)
March 16, 2015 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-3766815. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (klc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poore et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon Inc
Represented By: Kari L Sutherland
Represented By: Susan M Robinson
Represented By: Christy D Jones
Represented By: Daniel R Higginbotham
Represented By: William M Gage
Represented By: David B Thomas
Represented By: Jennifer L Steinmetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Kari L Sutherland
Represented By: Susan M Robinson
Represented By: Christy D Jones
Represented By: Daniel R Higginbotham
Represented By: William M Gage
Represented By: David B Thomas
Represented By: Jennifer L Steinmetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melody Poore
Represented By: Michelle L Tiger
Represented By: Lee B Balefsky
Represented By: Christopher A Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Poore
Represented By: Michelle L Tiger
Represented By: Lee B Balefsky
Represented By: Christopher A Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?