Fitzsimmons et al v. Lowe's Companies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kent Fitzsimmons and Nicole Weekley
Defendant: Lowe's Companies, Inc. and Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01109
Filed: March 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Referring Judge: Joe Billy McDade
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2020 Filing 10 Consent MOTION to Stay Deadlines Pending Decision of Judicial Panel on MDL on Defendants' Motion to Transfer by Defendants Lowe's Companies, Inc., Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. Responses due by 5/29/2020 (Barella, Derek)
May 15, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Lowe's Companies, Inc., Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Barella, Derek)
May 15, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Derek G Barella on behalf of All Defendants (Barella, Derek)
March 31, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Mark Richard Miller on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Miller, Mark)
March 24, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kent Fitzsimmons, Nicole Weekley.(Wallace, Edward)
March 23, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kent Fitzsimmons, Nicole Weekley. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC waiver sent on 3/20/2020, answer due 5/19/2020. (Wallace, Edward)
March 23, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kent Fitzsimmons, Nicole Weekley. Lowe's Companies, Inc. waiver sent on 3/20/2020, answer due 5/19/2020. (Wallace, Edward)
March 23, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/2/2020. (JRK, ilcd)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re subject matter jurisdiction. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 3/19/2020. (KZ, ilcd)
March 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Edward A Wallace on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Wallace, Edward)
March 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3332239.), filed by Kent Fitzsimmons, Nicole Weekley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wallace, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fitzsimmons et al v. Lowe's Companies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Derek G Barella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Represented By: Derek G Barella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kent Fitzsimmons
Represented By: Edward A Wallace
Represented By: Mark Richard Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Weekley
Represented By: Edward A Wallace
Represented By: Mark Richard Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?