Hexamer v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Sherry L Hexamer
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL and Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: CSS-Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2020cv01119
Filed: March 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Referring Judge: James E Shadid
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Pursuant to the Summons Returned executed as to the U.S. Attorney's Office #3 , Commissioner of Social Security answer due 7/28/2020. (JRK, ilcd)
April 29, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and summons served on Regional Chief Counsel on 04/17/2020, filed by Sherry L Hexamer. (Wombacher, William)
April 29, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint served on unreadable (U.S. Attorney General's Office, Washington, D.C.) on 04/03/2020, filed by Sherry L Hexamer. (Wombacher, William) Modified on 5/1/2020 to include language that this was served on US Atty General (JRK, ilcd).
April 29, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint served on US Attorney by Tami Richmond on 03/30/2020, filed by Sherry L Hexamer. (Wombacher, William) Modified on 5/1/2020 to correct/add text Summons Ret Ex(JRK, ilcd).
March 25, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (JRK, ilcd)
March 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Comissioner of Social Security, filed by Sherry L Hexamer. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Social Security Number, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(JRK, ilcd)
March 24, 2020 Filing fee received: $400, receipt number 0753-3335865 (JRK, ilcd)
March 24, 2020 Judge James E. Shadid and Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley added. (JRK, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hexamer v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry L Hexamer
Represented By: William C Wombacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CSS-Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?