Munsterman et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ardell Munsterman and Linda Munsterman
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 1:2020cv01204
Filed: May 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Referring Judge: Joe Billy McDade
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 Filing 50 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:13-cv-13305. .
May 25, 2020 Filing 49 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #39 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2039) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2042) - Pls' Mem in Supp of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2187) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2247) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2455) Part 1 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2455) Part 2 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2458) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2553) Part 1 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2553) Part 2 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2553) Part 3 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2621) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2839) Part 1 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2839) Part 2 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (2841) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (2957) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (3037) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (8071) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (8073) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (8791) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (8909) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames)(Robinson, Susan)
May 25, 2020 Filing 48 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #39 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2063) Part 1 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Juan Carlos Felix, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2063) Part 2 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Juan Carlos Felix, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2069) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Juan Carlos Felix, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2184) Part 1 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Juan Carlos Felix, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2184) Part 2 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Juan Carlos Felix, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2255) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Juan Carlos Felix, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (8711) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Juan Carlos Felix, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (8820) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Juan Carlos Felix)(Robinson, Susan)
May 25, 2020 Filing 47 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #39 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (6876) - Pls' Mot to Exclude C. Bryce Bowling, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (6877) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude C. Bryce Bowling, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (7020) Part 1 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude C. Bryce Bowling, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (7020) Part 2 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude C. Bryce Bowling, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (8706) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Bryce Bowling, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (8896) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Bryce Bowling)(Robinson, Susan)
May 25, 2020 Filing 46 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #39 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2050) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Nicole Fleischmann, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2051) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Nicole Fleischmann, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2159) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Nicole Fleischmann, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2230) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Nicole Fleischmann, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (8713) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Nicole Fleischmann, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (8869) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Nicole Fleischmann)(Robinson, Susan)
May 25, 2020 Filing 45 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #39 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (4877) Part 1- Pls' Mot to Exclude Lawrence Lind, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (4877) Part 2 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Lawrence Lind, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (4877) Part 3 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Lawrence Lind, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (4878) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Lawrence Lind, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (4945) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Lawrence Lind, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (8559) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Lawrence Lind, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (8560) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Lawrence Lind, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (8654) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Lawrence Lind, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (8728) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Lawrence Lind, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (8881) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Lawrence Lind)(Robinson, Susan)
May 25, 2020 Filing 44 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #39 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2270) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Dionysios Veronikis, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2271) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Dionysios Veronikis, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2284) - Pls' Resp to Def's Mot to Exclude Dionysios Veronikis, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2313) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Dionysios Veronikis, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2820) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Dionysios Veronikis, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2821) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Dionysios Veronikis, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2890) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Dionysios Veronikis, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3033) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Dionysios Veronikis, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (6964) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Dionysios Veronikis, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (8775) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Dionysios Veronikis, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (8861) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Dionysios Veronikis)(Robinson, Susan)
May 25, 2020 Filing 43 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #39 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2436) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2436) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2436) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2436) Part 4 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2436) Part 5 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2441) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2555) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2619) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (3663) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (3663) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (3663) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (3666) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (3792) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (3814) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (8783) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (8849) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Response to Defs' Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels)(Robinson, Susan)
May 25, 2020 Filing 42 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #39 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2071) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2071) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2071) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2074) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2144) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2209) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (3031) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3642) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (3642) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (3647) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (3751) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (3847) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (8781) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (8846) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays)(Robinson, Susan)
May 25, 2020 Filing 41 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #39 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2251) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 1 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 2 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 3 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (8804) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (8804) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (8804) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (8804) Part 4 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (8804) Part 5 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (8804) Part 6 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (8804) Part 7 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (8804) Part 8 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (8804) Part 9 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (8804) Part 10 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (8804) Part 11 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (8805) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (8829) - Defs' Supp Exhibit to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (8865) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev)(Robinson, Susan)
May 25, 2020 Filing 40 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #39 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2066) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 4 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 5 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 6 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2070) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 1- Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 2 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 3 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 4 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 5 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 6 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 7 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 8 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 9 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 10 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 11 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 12 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 13 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #21 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 14 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #22 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 15 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev)(Robinson, Susan)
May 25, 2020 Filing 39 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL ECF (238) - First Amended Master Long Form Complaint, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (239) - Master Answer of Ethicon, Inc. to First Amended Master Complaint, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (241) - Master Answer of Johnson & Johnson to First Amended Master Complaint, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (262) - Short Form Complaint, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (263) - Amended Short Form Complaint)(Robinson, Susan)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A directing that on 5/28/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 5/27/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/14/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (maw)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Pending in the cases on Exhibit A is Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendant's Non-Retained Experts; the motions are GRANTED to the extent plaintiffs seek an order excluding expert witnesses designated by the Ethicon defendants in excess of five; Plaintiffs' Motions are otherwise DENIED. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/11/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (MDL 2327; cases on Exhibit A) (st)
November 22, 2019 Filing 36 REPLY by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to #35 Response In Opposition,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D)(Robinson, Susan)
November 13, 2019 Filing 35 SUGGESTIONS by Ardell Munsterman, Linda Munsterman in opposition to #28 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1 - 4, #2 Exhibit 5A, #3 Exhibit 5B, #4 Exhibit 5C, #5 Exhibit 5D, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7A, #8 Exhibit 7B, #9 Exhibit 7C, #10 Exhibit 7D, #11 Exhibit 7E, #12 Exhibits 8 - 9)(Gunn, Amy)
November 13, 2019 Filing 34 OPPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to #30 MOTION by Ardell Munsterman, Linda Munsterman to Strike Defendants' Non-Retained Experts in Violation of the Court's Pretrial Order #337 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Gage, William)
November 7, 2019 Filing 33 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Suzanne Trupin on 11/12/19 at 3:00 p.m. CT (Robinson, Susan)
November 7, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Suzanne Trupin on 11/12/19 at 3:00 p.m. CT (Robinson, Susan)
October 31, 2019 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM by Ardell Munsterman, Linda Munsterman in Support of #30 MOTION by Ardell Munsterman, Linda Munsterman to Strike Defendants' Non-Retained Experts in Violation of the Court's Pretrial Order #337 (Gunn, Amy)
October 31, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION by Ardell Munsterman, Linda Munsterman to Strike Defendants' Non-Retained Experts in Violation of the Court's Pretrial Order #337 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Gunn, Amy)
October 29, 2019 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in Support of #28 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Robinson, Susan)
October 29, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - C)(Robinson, Susan)
October 17, 2019 Filing 27 RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUBPOENA for Dr. Dionysios Veronikis. (Gage, William)
October 17, 2019 Filing 26 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Dionysios Veronikis on October 27, 2019 at 8:00 a.m. (Gage, William)
October 9, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Dionysios Veronikis on TBD at TBD (Gage, William)
September 20, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case Specific Expert Witnesses and Non-Retained Expert Disclosures. (Gage, William)
September 17, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Friends and Family on dates and times to be determined (Robinson, Susan)
September 16, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Independent Medical Examination of Linda Munsterman by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-B)(Robinson, Susan)
August 16, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ardell Munsterman, Linda Munsterman for Plaintiff's Designation and Disclosure of General and Case-Specific Expert Witnesses. (Gunn, Amy)
July 18, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Johnson & Johnson for Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Interrogatories, Requests for Production, and Requests for Admissions. (Robinson, Susan)
July 18, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc. for Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Interrogatories, Requests for Production, and Requests for Admissions. (Robinson, Susan)
July 12, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ardell Munsterman for Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories. (Gunn, Amy)
July 12, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Linda Munsterman for Plaintiff's Responses to Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admissions and Requests for Production. (Gunn, Amy)
June 28, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Linda Munsterman and Ardell Munsterman on 8/7/19 at 9:00 a.m. and 1:00 p.m. CDT (Robinson, Susan)
June 20, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ardell Munsterman, Linda Munsterman for First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admissions and Requests for Production. (Gunn, Amy)
June 14, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc. for First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff, Ardell Munsterman. (Robinson, Susan)
June 14, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc. for First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission and Requests for Production to Plaintiff. (Robinson, Susan)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PRETRIAL ORDER # 337 (Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 12 Cases) The court ORDERS that the cases on Exhibit A are: (1) removed from the pending inactive docket; and (2) placed on the active docket. The court further ORDERS that: (1) The cases are no longer eligible for return to the inactive docket nor may notices of settlement be filed to relieve the parties from scheduling deadlines; (2) To the extent other defendants, in addition to Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson, are named in the cases on Exhibit A, the deadlines below also apply to them; (3) The Clerk will file this Docket Control Order in the main MDL and every case listed on Exhibit A become subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order; and (4) The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 12 cases with one important exception, as more fully set forth herein. Scheduling Deadlines. The following deadlines shall apply in all Ethicon Wave 12 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 05/11/2019. Defendant Fact Sheets due by 05/20/2019. Deadline for written discovery requests due by 06/20/2019. Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs due by 08/19/2019. Expert disclosure served by defendants due by 09/18/2019. Expert disclosure served for rebuttal due by 09/25/2019. Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 10/25/2019. Filing of dispositive motions due by 11/01/2019. Response to dispositive motions due by 11/15/2019. Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 11/22/2019. Filing of Daubert motions due by 11/04/2019. Responses to Daubert motions due by 11/18/2019. Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 11/25/2019. Confidential Documents. Issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 9/20/2019, and any response is due by 10/3/2019. Any reply is due by 10/10/2019. Venue Recommendations. The parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases no later than 10/08/2019, the parties are ORDERED to file joint venue recommendations by 10/18/2019. The parties' joint recommendation(s) shall identify cases where venue is in dispute. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/1/2019. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 12 cases identified on Exhibit A) (ts) (ADI)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting the Motions filed in MDL 2327 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Substitute Susan M. Robinson as Counsel in lieu of David B. Thomas, and to Substitute William M. Gage as Counsel in lieu of Christy D. Jones; the Clerk is directed to terminate Christy D. Jones and to substitute William M. Gage as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which Christy D. Jones is associated, and to terminate David B. Thomas and to substitute Susan M. Robinson as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which David B. Thomas is associated. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/24/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (ts) (ADI)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER The deadline to submit joint motions of dismissal is extended to 10/31/2018 for all cases in MDL 2327 currently on an inactive docket. All remaining provisions of Inactive Docket Orders entered in MDL 2327 and individual cases remain in effect. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/15/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases on inactive docket) (slr)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INACTIVE DOCKET ORDER: The court has been advised that the plaintiff(s) and Ethicon, Inc. have reached a settlement with regard to Ethicon. All discovery deadlines are continued until further order of the court. Plaintiff(s) and Ethicon may submit an agreed order of dismissal with prejudice on or before 8/31/2018; if settlements are not finalized and dismissal orders are not submitted by then the Court will have a hearing to determine the appropriate action pertaining to any remaining cases on the inactive docket. Counsel for plaintiffs and defendant(s) are directed to provide quarterly reports as to their progress in dismissing cases on the inactive docket. This Order is related to the Proposed Inactive Docket Order filed at ECF No. 5499 in MDL Case No. 2327 Ethicon. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/6/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (st)
February 6, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Suzanne Trupin on 4/13/2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Thomas, David)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRETRIAL ORDER # 280 (Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 8 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING ETHICON, INC. CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 8 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. For any cases in the Ethicon, Inc. MDL with a Covidien Wave 1 flag, the stay on the flagged Covidien Wave 1 cases is lifted and the Covidien Wave 1 cases in the Ethicon MDL are incorporated in the Ethicon, Inc., Wave 8 cases and subject to this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 8 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 8 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 8 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (lca) (ADI)
February 2, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kari L. Sutherland on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Sutherland, Kari)
February 9, 2016 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by William M. Gage on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Gage, William)
December 16, 2014 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy)
July 1, 2013 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David)
June 5, 2013 Filing 2 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 50 (Revised Short Form Complaint and Amended Short Form Complaint re: Removal of Coloplast and Endo entities) entered on 05/29/2013 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (jap)
June 4, 2013 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-2454409. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Munsterman et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.
Represented By: Susan M Robinson
Represented By: Christy D Jones
Represented By: Kari L Sutherland
Represented By: William M Gage
Represented By: David B Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Susan M Robinson
Represented By: Christy D Jones
Represented By: Kari L Sutherland
Represented By: William M Gage
Represented By: David B Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ardell Munsterman
Represented By: Amy Collignon Gunn
Represented By: John G Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Munsterman
Represented By: Amy Collignon Gunn
Represented By: John G Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?