Nickels v. U.S. Bank N.A.
Plaintiff: Christopher D. Nickles and Christopher D Nickels
Defendant: U.S. Bank N.A.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01238
Filed: June 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Referring Judge: Joe Billy McDade
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christopher D Nickels. U.S. Bank N.A. waiver sent on 7/22/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (Taylor, Alexander)
July 24, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Erin Leigh Hoffman on behalf of U.S. Bank N.A. (Hoffman, Erin)
July 22, 2020 Filing 6 Alias Summons Issued as to U.S. Bank N.A. (VH, ilcd)
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Returned Unexecuted (CT Corp was the incorrect party to serve) by Christopher D Nickels as to U.S. Bank N.A.. (Taylor, Alexander) Modified on 7/22/2020 to add language regarding why summons unexecuted. (VH, ilcd).
July 13, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christopher D Nickels. U.S. Bank N.A. served on 7/10/2020, answer due 7/31/2020. (Taylor, Alexander)
June 29, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to U.S. Bank N.A. (VH, ilcd)
June 24, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Alexander James Taylor on behalf of Christopher D. Nickles (Taylor, Alexander)
June 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. Bank N.A. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3407610.), filed by Christopher D. Nickles. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Taylor, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nickels v. U.S. Bank N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher D. Nickles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher D Nickels
Represented By: Alexander James Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank N.A.
Represented By: Erin Leigh Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?