Kuznik v. Hooters of America, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Austin Kuznik
Defendant: Hooters of America, LLC and HOA Restaurant Holder, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01255
Filed: July 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Referring Judge: Joe Billy McDade
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #11 UNOPPOSED Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #6 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint. Parties agreed to a response ddl of 9/11/2020. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 8/31/20. (WG, ilcd)
August 28, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Unopposed Motion) by Plaintiff Austin Kuznik. Responses due by 9/11/2020 (Sons, Catherine)
August 14, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Catherine P Sons on behalf of Austin Kuznik (Sons, Catherine)
August 14, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by James X Bormes on behalf of Austin Kuznik (Bormes, James)
August 14, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT re #6 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint of Angelica Wheeler by HOA Restaurant Holder, LLC, Hooters of America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hines, Erin)
August 14, 2020 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint filed by Defendants HOA Restaurant Holder, LLC, Hooters of America, LLC. (Hines, Erin)
August 14, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint by Defendants HOA Restaurant Holder, LLC, Hooters of America, LLC. Responses due by 8/28/2020 (Hines, Erin)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #5 unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Defendants HOA Restaurant Holder, LLC and Hooters of America, LLC answers are due 8/14/2020. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 7/13/20. (WG, ilcd)
July 10, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Defendants HOA Restaurant Holder, LLC, Hooters of America, LLC. Responses due by 7/24/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Agreed Order)(Hines, Erin)
July 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Amy Yongmee Cho on behalf of All Defendants (Cho, Amy)
July 8, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by HOA Restaurant Holder, LLC, Hooters of America, LLC. (Hines, Erin)
July 8, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Erin Bolan Hines on behalf of HOA Restaurant Holder, LLC, Hooters of America, LLC (Hines, Erin)
July 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from McLean County, Illinois, case number 2020CH000059 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3418105), filed by HOA Restaurant Holder, LLC, Hooters of America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Benjamin Benson, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Hines, Erin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kuznik v. Hooters of America, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hooters of America, LLC
Represented By: Erin Bolan Hines
Represented By: Amy Yongmee Cho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOA Restaurant Holder, LLC
Represented By: Erin Bolan Hines
Represented By: Amy Yongmee Cho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Austin Kuznik
Represented By: James X Bormes
Represented By: Catherine P Sons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?