Williams v. McCoy et al
Plaintiff: Jared W Williams
Defendant: Michael D McCoy and Jennifer ..
Case Number: 1:2020cv01266
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: James E Shadid
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 8/25/2020. Plaintiff's petition for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is granted #9 . Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b) (1), Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $20.27. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to forward the initial partial filing fee from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court within 30 days of this order. After payment of the initial partial filing fee (or immediately if no funds are available for that payment) the agency having custody of Plaintiff shall make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court. Income includes all deposits from any source, including gifts. The agency having custody of the plaintiff shall forward these payments each time Plaintiff's account exceeds $10, until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. Plaintiff is ultimately responsible for ensuring that the initial partial filing fee and required monthly payments are made. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this case. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff's place of confinement, to the attention of the Trust Fund Office, and to Plaintiff.(SAG, ilcd)
August 24, 2020 Filing 10 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by Jared W Williams (SAG, ilcd)
August 24, 2020 Filing 9 PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Jared W Williams.(SAG, ilcd)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 8/14/2020. Plaintiff filed his complaint on July 16, 2020 #1 . On the same day, the Court noted Plaintiff had not filed a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (IFP) nor had he paid the $400 filing fee in person. See July 16, 2020, order. Plaintiff was given an IFP form to assist him and allowed an additional 21 days to either pay the fee or file this motion. Plaintiff was again reminded on July 21, 2020, he must either pay the fee or file an IFP motion on or before August 6, 2020, or his case would be dismissed. See July 21, 2020, Text Order. The deadline has passed and Plaintiff has now filed a motion for an extension of time #7 . Plaintiff simply says he needs a 30-day extension "due to paperwork." #7 . Plaintiff was responsible for payment of the filing fee on the day he filed his lawsuit. Therefore, Plaintiff cannot proceed with his lawsuit unless he either pays the $400 filing fee or he is granted leave to proceed IFP. The Court also notes Plaintiff has filed previous lawsuits and knows how to file the form since he was granted leave to proceed IFP. See Williams v. Smith, 19-1044. Therefore, the Court will allow Plaintiff one additional extension of time, but not the 30 days requested. Plaintiff's motion is granted in part and denied in part #7 . Plaintiff MUST either pay the $400 fee in full on or before September 4, 2020, or he must file an IFP form on or before September 4, 2020. To prevent any further delays, the Clerk is to provide Plaintiff with another copy of the IFP form. Plaintiff is admonished he must fully complete the IFP form and must indicate whether he has received any income from any source including gifts from family or friends. If Plaintiff either fails to pay the $400 fee or fails to submit his completed IFP form on or before September 4, 2020, his case will be dismissed. (SAG, ilcd)
August 12, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time by Plaintiff Jared W Williams. Responses due by 8/26/2020 (JRK, ilcd)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 7/21/2020. Plaintiff's motion for service of process at government expense is denied as moot #4 . As noted, Plaintiff has not paid the $400 filing fee, nor has he filed a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (IFP). Plaintiff must either pay the fee or file an IFP motion on or before August 6, 2020, or his case will be dismissed. See July 16, 2020, Text Order. (SAG, ilcd)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 7/16/2020. Plaintiff has filed a Complaint but has not paid the $400 filing fee nor filed a petition to proceed in forma pauperis. Within 21 days of the entry of this order, Plaintiff must pay the $400 filing fee in full or file a petition to proceed in forma pauperis with attached trust fund ledgers for the last 6 months. Failure to comply without good cause will result in dismissal of this case without prejudice, and the Plaintiff will still be responsible for payment of the filing fee. See 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1914. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff the forms for proceeding in forma pauperis.(SAG, ilcd)
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by Jared W Williams (SAG, ilcd)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Service of Process at Government Expense by Plaintiff Jared W Williams. Responses due by 7/30/2020 (SAG, ilcd)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Jared W Williams. Responses due by 7/30/2020 (SAG, ilcd)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge James Shadid. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Peoria Division, 100 NE Monroe Street, Peoria, IL 61602. Merit Review Deadline set for 8/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(SAG, ilcd)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jared W Williams.(SAG, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. McCoy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael D McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer ..
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared W Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?