Warren v. Entzel
Petitioner: Bryan Keith Warren
Respondent: F. Entzel
Case Number: 1:2020cv01275
Filed: July 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Michael M Mihm
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Filing 7 Letter from Bryan Warren requesting copy of docket sheet. Clerk forwards copy of docket sheet to petitioner. (TK, ilcd)
September 16, 2020 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Bryan Keith Warren as to F. Entzel. US Attorneys Office served on 9/14/2020 (AEM, ilcd)
September 14, 2020 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed on 9/11/2020 by Bryan Keith Warren as to F. Entzel. (AEM, ilcd)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Bryan Keith Warren: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2243 and 2241, the Court's preliminary review indicates Warren's Petition could have merit and therefore orders Respondent to show cause, if any it may have, within twenty-one (21) days of service of this Order, why said writ should not be granted with respect to Petitioner's claims. Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 9/10/2020. (AEM, ilcd)
August 25, 2020 Prisoner Initial Partial Filing Fee received 8/25/20, in the amount of $ 5.00; receipt number 14626038382 (FDS, ilcd)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Letter from Bryan Warren Regarding filing fee (AEM, ilcd) Modified on 8/19/2020 to correct spelling(TK, ilcd).
August 6, 2020 Filing 2 Letter from Bryan Keith Warren (SAG, ilcd) Modified on 8/7/2020 to correct date of filing (SAG, ilcd).
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: On July 27, 2020, Petitioner filed his #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus under 28 U.S.C. 2241. The Court has not yet received Petitioners $5.00 filing fee. Petitioner is HEREBY instructed to pay the $5.00 filing fee within 30 days of this Order. If Petitioner is unable to pay the required filing fee, he may file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. If Petitioner fails to pay the required filing fee or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days of the entry of this Order (Deadline 8/28/2020), his Petition will be dismissed without prejudice by the Court. Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 7/29/2020. (KH1, ilcd)
July 27, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus under 28 USC Section 2241, filed by Bryan Keith Warren.(RK, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warren v. Entzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bryan Keith Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: F. Entzel
Represented By: W. Scott Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?