Taylor v. Partt et al
Plaintiff: Kennado K Taylor
Defendant: . Rebecca, Sue E Myerscough, Colin Stirling Bruce, Michael M Mihm, J Partt, Sara Darrow, James E Shadid, R Smith, . Peter and Harold A Baker
Case Number: 1:2020cv01291
Filed: August 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Harold A Baker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 Filing 16 PLRA FEE NOTICE AND ORDER as to #7 Notice of Appeal filed by Kennado K Taylor: This court's records indicate that on August 25, 2020 the District Court denied your motion toproceed in forma pauperis. WITHIN THE NEXT THIRTY (30) DAYS YOU MUST EITHER: 1. Pay the required $500.00 docketing fee PLUS the $5.00 notice of appeal filing fee to the District Court Clerk, if you have not already done so. File a motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis with the Court of Appeals, with proof of service on your opponent. Further, this appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that all other proceedings in this appeal are SUSPENDED pending the assessment and payment of any necessary fees. (TK, ilcd)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 8/25/2020. Plaintiff has filed a petition for leave to appeal in forma pauperis and memo explaining his grounds for appeal. 28 U.S.C. Sec 1915(a)(3) provides that "an appeal may not be taken in forma pauperis if the trial court certifies in writing that it is not taken in good faith." An appeal taken in "good faith" is not about the movant's sincerity or motivation. A good faith appeal is an appeal that "a reasonable person could suppose... has some merit" from a legal perspective. Walker v. O'Brien, 216 F.3d 626, 632 (7th Cir. 2000). Upon review of the record, the Court sees no good faith grounds for appeal within the meaning of 28 U.S.C. Sec 1915(a)(3). The Court is already determining whether Plaintiff is in imminent danger in case 20-1245. If Plaintiff needs to supplement his imminent danger allegations in case 20-cv-1245, he may do so. The Court certifies that Plaintiff's appeal is not in good faith within the meaning of 28 U.S.C. Sec 1915(a)(3). Accordingly, Plaintiff's petition to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is denied. #9 . If Plaintiff wishes to contest this court's finding, he must renew his petition to proceed in forma pauperis with the Court of Appeals within 30 days after service of this order. See Fed.R.App.P. 24(a). The clerk is directed to send a copy of this order to the Seventh Circuit Court of Appeals. (KE, ilcd)
August 24, 2020 Filing 15 PLRA Fee Notice and Order re #7 Notice of Appeal. Within the next 14 days, Appellant must either pay $505 filing fee or file IFP on appeal. (AEM, ilcd)
August 24, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re #7 Notice of Appeal filed by Kennado K Taylor. USCA Case Number 20-2591 (AEM, ilcd)
August 21, 2020 Filing 13 Short Record of Appeal Sent to US Court of Appeals re #7 Notice of Appeal (AEM, ilcd)
August 21, 2020 Filing 12 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION SHEET by Kennado K Taylor (AEM, ilcd)
August 21, 2020 Filing 11 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by Kennado K Taylor (AEM, ilcd)
August 21, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM re #9 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Kennado K Taylor. (AEM, ilcd)
August 21, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Kennado K Taylor. Responses due by 9/4/2020 (AEM, ilcd)
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Kennado K Taylor re #7 Notice of Appeal (AEM, ilcd)
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to Text Order on Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, by Kennado K Taylor. (AEM, ilcd)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 8/17/2020. Plaintiff's petition to proceed in forma pauperis is denied. #3 . Plaintiff has accumulated at least three strikes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec 1915(g), and he already has two cases proceeding in this District under the imminent danger exception with similar allegations (20-cv-1240 and 20-cv-1245). This case is dismissed without prejudice and closed for Plaintiff's failure to pay the filing fee. Pending motions are moot. #5 , #6 . (KE, ilcd)
August 11, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Kennado K Taylor. Responses due by 8/25/2020 (KE, ilcd)
August 11, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Kennado K Taylor. Responses due by 8/25/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(KE, ilcd)
August 11, 2020 Filing 4 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Kennado K Taylor (KE, ilcd)
August 11, 2020 Filing 3 PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Kennado K Taylor.(KE, ilcd)
August 11, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Harold A. Baker. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Springfield Division, 600 E Monroe, Springfield,IL 62701.Merit Review Deadline set for 8/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(KE, ilcd)
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kennado K Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(KE, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Partt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Rebecca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sue E Myerscough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colin Stirling Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael M Mihm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Partt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Darrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E Shadid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Peter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kennado K Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?