Hospital Sisters Health System v. Great American Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Hospital Sisters Health System
Defendant: Great American Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv01295
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Referring Judge: Michael M Mihm
2 Judge: Sue E Myerscough
3 Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hospital Sisters Health System. Great American Insurance Company waiver sent on 8/21/2020, answer due 10/20/2020. (Marrinson, Thomas)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Michael A. Graziano of Eckert Seamans Cherin & Mellott, LLC. Attorneys for Great American Insurance Company on August 21, 2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Marrinson, Thomas)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: It appears Plaintiff's counsel inadvertently filed this case in the Peoria Division of the U.S. District Court for the Central District of Illinois. The caption of the Complaint identifies the Springfield Division of this Court and there are no allegations which indicate this case arose from any of the counties within the Peoria Division. See CDIL-LR 40.1. The Clerk is therefore directed to TRANSFER this case to the Springfield Division of the U.S. District Court for the Central District of Illinois. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 8/18/2020. (KZ, ilcd)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Caroline M Upton on behalf of Hospital Sisters Health System (Upton, Caroline)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Thomas Allen Marrinson on behalf of Hospital Sisters Health System (Marrinson, Thomas)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Great American Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3450292.), filed by Hospital Sisters Health System. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Crime Great American Policy, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Summons)(Marrinson, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hospital Sisters Health System v. Great American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hospital Sisters Health System
Represented By: Thomas Allen Marrinson
Represented By: Caroline M Upton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?