Redfern et al v. Pfizer, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rebecca L. Redfearn, Christina Hart and Rebecca L Redfern
Defendant: Warner Lambert Company, LLC, Pfizer, Inc., Pharmacia Corporation, Parke, Davis & Co., Warner Lambert Company, Warner Lambert Company LLC, Pharmacia LLC, Parke, Davis & Company LLC and Warner-Lambert Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv01296
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara Darrow
Referring Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
2 Judge: James E Shadid
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss , to Strike, and For a More Definite Statement by Parke, Davis & Company LLC, Pfizer, Inc., Pharmacia LLC, Warner Lambert Company LLC. (Rankin, William)
October 6, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss , to Strike, and For a More Definite Statement by Defendants Parke, Davis & Company LLC, Pfizer, Inc., Pharmacia LLC, Warner Lambert Company LLC. Responses due by 10/20/2020 (Rankin, William)
October 1, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Daniel M Meyers on behalf of All Defendants (Meyers, Daniel)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #7 Amended Complaint. Defendants Parke, Davis & Company LLC as successor-in-interest of Parke, Davis & Company, Pfizer, Inc., Pharmacia LLC f/k/a Pharmacia Corporation answer and Warner Lambert Company LLC f/k/a Warner-Lambert Company answer due 10/6/2020. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 9/30/20. (WG, ilcd)
September 29, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #7 Amended Complaint, (Agreed Motion) by Defendants Parke, Davis & Co., Parke, Davis & Company LLC as successor-in-interest of Parke, Davis & Company, Pfizer, Inc., Pharmacia Corporation, Pharmacia LLC f/k/a Pharmacia Corporation, Warner Lambert Company, Warner Lambert Company LLC f/k/a Warner-Lambert Company, Warner Lambert Company, LLC. Responses due by 10/13/2020 (Rankin, William)
September 29, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Parke, Davis & Co., Parke, Davis & Company LLC as successor-in-interest of Parke, Davis & Company, Pfizer, Inc., Pharmacia Corporation, Pharmacia LLC f/k/a Pharmacia Corporation, Warner Lambert Company, Warner Lambert Company LLC f/k/a Warner-Lambert Company, Warner Lambert Company, LLC. (Rankin, William)
September 29, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by William Jason Rankin on behalf of All Defendants (Rankin, William)
August 31, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint against Pfizer, Inc., Pharmacia LLC f/k/a Pharmacia Corporation, Parke, Davis & Company LLC as successor-in-interest of Parke, Davis & Company, Warner Lambert Company LLC f/k/a Warner-Lambert Company, filed by Rebecca L Redfern, Christina Hart. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Warner Lambert Company, #2 Summons - Pharmacia LLC, #3 Summons - Parke, Davis & Company LLC)(Kassan, Randi)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Strike #4 Amended Complaint. Court strikes the #4 Amended Complaint and directs Plaintiff to file a Second Amended Complaint. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 8/31/20. (WG, ilcd)
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Strike #4 Amended Complaint, by Plaintiffs Christina Hart, Rebecca L Redfern. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Kassan, Randi)
August 26, 2020 Filing 4 STRICKEN AMENDED COMPLAINT In Response to Order re: Subject Matter Jurisdiction against Parke, Davis & Co., Pfizer, Inc., Pharmacia Corporation, Warner Lambert Company, Warner Lambert Company, LLC, filed by Rebecca L. Redfearn, Christina Hart.(Kassan, Randi) Modified on 8/31/2020 to show stricken per 8/31/20 order (WG, ilcd).
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re subject matter jurisdiction. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 8/24/2020. (KZ, ilcd)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued and returned to counsel to effect service. (ED, ilcd)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER of RECUSAL. Judge James E. Shadid disqualifies and recuses himself from participation in this matter pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455(b)(2). Pursuant to instructions from Chief Judge Sara Darrow, this case is reassigned to Chief Judge Sara Darrow for all further proceedings. Entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 8/19/2020. (TK, ilcd) Modified on 8/19/2020 for clarification(TK, ilcd).
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Parke, Davis & Co., Pfizer, Inc., Pharmacia Corporation, Warner Lambert Company, Warner Lambert Company, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3450384.), filed by Rebecca L. Redfearn, Christina Hart. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon - Parke, Davis & Co., #3 Summons - Pfizer, #4 Summons - Pharmacia Corporation, #5 Summons - Warner Lamber Company LLC, #6 Summons - Warner Lambert Company)(Kassan, Randi) (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/19/2020) (ED, ilcd). (Attachment 3 replaced on 8/19/2020) (ED, ilcd). (Attachment 4 replaced on 8/19/2020) (ED, ilcd). (Attachment 5 replaced on 8/19/2020) (ED, ilcd). (Attachment 6 replaced on 8/19/2020) (ED, ilcd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Redfern et al v. Pfizer, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Lambert Company, LLC
Represented By: William Jason Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer, Inc.
Represented By: William Jason Rankin
Represented By: Daniel M Meyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacia Corporation
Represented By: William Jason Rankin
Represented By: Daniel M Meyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parke, Davis & Co.
Represented By: William Jason Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Lambert Company
Represented By: William Jason Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Lambert Company LLC
Represented By: William Jason Rankin
Represented By: Daniel M Meyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacia LLC
Represented By: William Jason Rankin
Represented By: Daniel M Meyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parke, Davis & Company LLC
Represented By: William Jason Rankin
Represented By: Daniel M Meyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner-Lambert Company
Represented By: William Jason Rankin
Represented By: Daniel M Meyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca L. Redfearn
Represented By: Randi Alyson Kassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Hart
Represented By: Randi Alyson Kassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca L Redfern
Represented By: Randi Alyson Kassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?