Dietrich v. Brock et al
Plaintiff: Benjamin Dietrich
Defendant: Jim Brown, Jerry Littlefield and Rich Brock
Case Number: 1:2020cv01307
Filed: August 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sue E Myerscough
Referring Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 10/21/2020. Plaintiff alleges that Defendants used excessive force, apparently incident to Plaintiff's arrest on August 31, 2018. Plaintiff is not incarcerated and has paid the $400 filing fee in full. Accordingly, Plaintiff is responsible for serving Defendants. See CDIL-LR 16.3(D)("If the full statutory filing fee is paid, the plaintiff is responsible for arranging for service."). Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m) requires the complaint to be served within 90 days of the filing of the complaint. However, the Notice of Case Opening indicated that Plaintiff should await a merit review order pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915A. Section 1915A does not apply because Plaintiff was not a prisoner when he filed this action, so no merit review order will enter. Good cause exists to extend Plaintiff's time for serving the complaint to January 15, 2021. If Plaintiff has not filed proof of service by January 15, 2021, then this case will be dismissed without prejudice for failure to serve. (KE, ilcd)
August 31, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 14626038404 (KE, ilcd)
August 28, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Sue E Myerscough. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Springfield Division, 600 E Monroe, Springfield,IL 62701.Merit Review Deadline set for 9/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(KE, ilcd)
August 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Benjamin Dietrich.(KE, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dietrich v. Brock et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Littlefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rich Brock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Dietrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?