Payton v. IDOC et al
Plaintiff: Alexander Payton, Sr.
Defendant: IDOC and Veanna
Case Number: 1:2020cv01318
Filed: September 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Joe Billy McDade
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Filing 5 JUDGMENT entered in a civil case (SAG, ilcd)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MERIT REVIEW ORDER entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 9/15/2020. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED: Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice to Plaintiff pursuing his claims in the Illinois Courts. All internal deadlines and pending matters are rendered MOOT. SEE FULL WRITTEN ORDER.(SAG, ilcd) (Main Document 4 replaced on 9/21/2020) (SAG, ilcd).
September 10, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Joe Billy McDade. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Peoria Division, 100 NE Monroe Street, Peoria, IL 61602. Merit Review Deadline set for 9/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(SAG, ilcd)
September 9, 2020 Filing 3 PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Alexander Payton, Sr.(SAG, ilcd)
September 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Alexander Payton, Sr.(SAG, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Payton v. IDOC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IDOC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Payton, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?