Fisher et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jeremy Fisher and Christal Fisher
Defendant: Ethicon Inc and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 1:2020cv01365
Filed: October 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Referring Judge: Joe Billy McDade
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Filing 55 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:16-cv-08319. .
October 12, 2020 Filing 54 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #44 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2060) - Pls Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2065) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2134) Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2232) Pls Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (7346) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot of Timothy Ulatowski, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2910) Defs Supp Resp and Notice of Adoption of Resp Regarding Timothy Ulatowski, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (8529) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot of Timothy Ulatowski, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (8623) Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp Regarding Timothy Ulatowski)(Gage, William)
October 12, 2020 Filing 53 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #44 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2039) - Pls Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2042) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2187) Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2247) Pls Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2455) Part 1 Pls Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2455) Part 2 Pls Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2458) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2553) Part 1 Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2553) Part 2 Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2553) Part 3 Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2621) Pls Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2839) Part 1 Pls Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2839) Part 2 Pls Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (2841) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (2957) Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (3037) Pls Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (8071) Pls Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (8073) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (8557) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (8644) Notice of Adoption of Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames)(Gage, William)
October 12, 2020 Filing 52 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #44 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2425) Pls Mot to Exclude Peter Rosenblatt, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2428) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Peter Rosenblatt, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2535) Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Peter Rosenblatt, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2625) Pls Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Peter Rosenblatt, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (8505) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot to Exclude Peter Rosenblatt, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (8635) Notice of Adoption of Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Peter Rosenblatt)(Gage, William)
October 12, 2020 Filing 51 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #44 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2087) Pls Mot to Exclude Kimberly Kenton, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2088) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Kimberly Kenton, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2132) Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Kimberly Kenton, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2244) Pls Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Kimberly Kenton, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2939) Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Kimberly Kenton, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (8493) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot to Exclude Kimberly Kenton, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (8651) Notice of Adoption of Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Kimberly Kenton)(Gage, William)
October 12, 2020 Filing 50 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #44 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2063) Part 1 Pls Mot to Exclude Juan Carlos Felix, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2063) Part 2 Pls Mot to Exclude Juan Carlos Felix, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2069) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Juan Carlos Felix, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2184) Part 1 Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Juan Carlos Felix, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2184) Part 2 Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Juan Carlos Felix, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2255) Pls Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Juan Carlos Felix, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (8481) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot to Exclude Juan Carlos Felix, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (8608) Notice of Adoption of Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Juan Carlos Felix)(Gage, William)
October 12, 2020 Filing 49 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #44 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2075) - Def's Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2078) - Def's Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2172) - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2214) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2759) - Def's Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2760) - Def's Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2949) - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3017) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (8531) Notice of Adoption of Defs Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (8596) Notice of Adoption of Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence)(Gage, William)
October 12, 2020 Filing 48 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #44 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2071) Part 1 - Def's Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2071) Part 2 - Def's Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2071) Part 3 - Def's Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2074) - Def's Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2144) - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2209) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (3031) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3642) Part 1 - Def's Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (3642) Part 2 - Def's Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (3647) - Def's Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (3751) - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Jimmy W. Mays, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (3847) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Jimmy W. Mays, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (8521) Notice of Adoption of Defs Mot to Exclude Jimmy W. Mays, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (8591) Notice of Adoption of Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Jimmy W. Mays)(Gage, William)
October 12, 2020 Filing 47 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #44 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (1994) - Def's Mot to Exclude Neeraj Kohli, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (1995) - Def's Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Neeraj Kohli, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2178) - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Neeraj Kohli, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2218) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Neeraj Kohli, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2806) Part 1 - Def's Mot to Exclude Neeraj Kohli, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2806) Part 2 - Def's Mot to Exclude Neeraj Kohli, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2806) Part 3 - Def's Mot to Exclude Neeraj Kohli, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2809) - Def's Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Neeraj Kohli, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2944) Part 1 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Neeraj Kohli, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2944) Part 2 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Neeraj Kohli, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2944) Part 3 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Neeraj Kohli, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2944) Part 4 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Neeraj Kohli, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (3023) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Neeraj Kohli, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (8533) Notice of Adoption of Defs Mot to Exclude Neeraj Kohli, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (8589) Notice of Adoption of Pls Resp Defs Mot to Exclude Neeraj Kohli)(Gage, William)
October 12, 2020 Filing 46 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #44 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (3865) Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (8075) Part 1 Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (8075) Part 2 Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (8075) Part 3 Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (8075) Part 4 Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (8075) Part 5 Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (8075) Part 6 Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (8075) Part 7 Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (8075) Part 8 Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (8075) Part 9 Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (8075) Part 10 Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (8076) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (8322) Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (8512) Notice of Adoption of Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (8585) Notice of Adoption of Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev)(Gage, William)
October 12, 2020 Filing 45 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #44 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2066) Part 1 - Def's Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 2 - Def's Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 3 - Def's Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 4 - Def's Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 5 - Def's Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 6 - Def's Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2070) - Def's Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Valimir Iakovlev, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 1 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 2 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 3 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 4 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 5 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 6 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 7 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 8 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 9 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 10 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 11 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 12 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 13 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #21 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 14 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #22 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 15 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #23 Exhibit MDL ECF (2251) Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #24 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 1 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #25 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 2 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #26 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 3 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev)(Gage, William)
October 12, 2020 Filing 44 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL ECF (238) First Amended Master Long Form Complaint, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (239) Master Answer of Ethicon, Inc. to First Amended Master Complaint, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (241) Master Answer of Johnson & Johnson to First Amended Master Complaint, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (262) - Short Form Complaint, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (263) Amended Short Form Complaint)(Gage, William)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A directing that on 10/23/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 10/22/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/9/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (kew)
September 3, 2019 Filing 42 REPLY by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to #40 Response In Opposition. (Gage, William)
August 29, 2019 Filing 41 RESPONSE by Christal Fisher, Jeremy Fisher in opposition to #37 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Limit the Case-Specific Testimony of Neeraj Kohli, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Expert Disclosure, #2 Proposed Order)(Nefzger, William)
August 28, 2019 Filing 40 RESPONSE by Christal Fisher, Jeremy Fisher in opposition to #35 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Ethicon's Objections and Responses, #2 Johnson & Johnson Objections and Responses, #3 IFU Proof, #4 Expert Disclosures, #5 Dr. Pence Report, #6 Dr. Kholi Report, #7 ICPA, #8 Proposed Order)(Nefzger, William)
August 26, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL by Sarah Elizabeth Hackman as Attorney of record on behalf of Christal Fisher, Jeremy Fisher (Hackman, Sarah)
August 14, 2019 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in support of #37 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Limit the Case-Specific Testimony of Neeraj Kohli, M.D. (Gage, William)
August 14, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Limit the Case-Specific Testimony of Neeraj Kohli, M.D. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Gage, William)
August 13, 2019 Filing 36 MEMORANDUM by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in support of #35 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Gage, William)
August 13, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Gage, William)
August 2, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Neeraj Kohli, M.D. on 8/28/2019 at 1:00 p.m. (Gage, William)
August 1, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE TO TAKE VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Christal Fisher, Jeremy Fisher of Amanda Fisher Cebuhar and Michelle Markley on TBD at TBD (Nefzger, William)
August 1, 2019 Filing 32 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Friends and Family on a date to be determined at a time to be determined (Modak-Truran, Anita)
August 1, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Christal Fisher, Jeremy Fisher of Neeraj Kohli, M.D. and Jing Qiao, M.D. on TBD at TBD (Nefzger, William)
July 30, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of friends and family on to be determined at to be determined (Modak-Truran, Anita)
June 27, 2019 Filing 29 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Suzanne Holthaus, MD on 07/17/2019 at 1:00 pm (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PTO 38 Deposition Protocol, #2 Exhibit Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition)(Tharp, Andrew)
June 27, 2019 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case Specific Expert Witnesses and Non-Retained Expert Disclosures. (Gage, William)
June 12, 2019 Filing 27 JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING THE PARTIES' TIMELY SERVICE DISCOVERY RESPONSES by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Christal Fisher, Jeremy Fisher. (Gage, William) (Modified on 6/24/2019 to add party filer) (lca).
May 29, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE by Christal Fisher, Jeremy Fisher in opposition to #24 Certificate of Service. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Nefzger, William)
May 24, 2019 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Christal Fisher, Jeremy Fisher for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case-Specific Expert Witnesses. (Nefzger, William)
May 22, 2019 Filing 24 AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories, Request for Production, and Request for Admissions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Gage, William)
May 21, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Suzanne Holthaus, MD on June 21, 2019 at 1:00 p.m. CT (Modak-Truran, Anita)
May 14, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Katie A. Fillmore on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Fillmore, Katie)
May 7, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE by Christal Fisher, Jeremy Fisher re: #19 Certificate of Service (Hackman, Sarah)
May 2, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Christal and Jeremy Fisher on May 21, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. and 1:00 p.m. CT (Attachments: #1 Appendix Subpoena to Christal Fisher, #2 Appendix Subpoena to Jeremy Fisher)(Modak-Truran, Anita)
April 24, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories, Request for Production and Request for Admissions. (Modak-Truran, Anita)
April 10, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Christal Fisher, Jeremy Fisher for Responses to First Set of Requests for Admission, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production. (Hackman, Sarah)
March 25, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Christal Fisher, Jeremy Fisher for First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission, and Requests for Production to Defendant. (Hackman, Sarah)
March 19, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Andrew David Tharp on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Tharp, Andrew)
March 8, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc. for First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission and Requests for Production to Plaintiff. (Modak-Truran, Anita)
March 6, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Anita Modak-Truran on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Modak-Truran, Anita)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRETRIAL ORDER # 328 (Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 11 Cases) The cases on Exhibit A are: 1. removed from the pending inactive docket; and 2. placed on the active docket. As to the cases on Exhibits A and B: 1. The cases are no longer eligible for return to the inactive docket nor may notices of settlement be filed to relieve the parties from scheduling deadlines; 2. To the extent other defendants, in addition to Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson, are named in the cases on Exhibits A and B, the deadlines below also apply to them; 3. The Clerk will file this Docket Control Order in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in the main MDL, every case listed on Exhibits A and B (hereinafter referred to as "Wave 11 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order.; and 4. The following deadlines immediately apply in all Ethicon Wave 11 cases with one important exception. If any of the cases on any exhibit were previously on a docket control order and dispositive and Daubert deadlines had passed before such cases became inactive, the parties may not file or refile dispositive or Daubert motions without first seeking leave of court for good cause shown. A. SCHEDULING DEADLINES.. The following deadlines shall apply in all Ethicon Wave 11 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due 02/15/2019; Defendant Fact Sheets due 02/22/2019; Deadline for written discovery requests due 03/25/2019; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs due 05/24/2019; Expert disclosure served by defendants due 06/24/2019; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal due 07/01/2019; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due 08/01/2019; Filing of dispositive motions due 08/14/2019; Response to dispositive motions due 08/28/2019; Reply to response to dispositive motions due 09/04/2019; Filing of Daubert motions due 08/14/2019; Responses to Daubert motions due 08/29/2019; Reply to response to Daubert motions due 09/05/2019. B. MOTION PRACTICE. 3. Confidential Documents. Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 6/27/2019, and any response is due by 7/11/2019. Any reply is due by 7/18/2019. The court expects full compliance with Local Rule of Civil Procedure 26.4(c). C. CASES READY FOR TRANSFER, REMAND OR TRIAL 1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 7/8/2019, the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 7/15/2019. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 2/4/2019. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 11 cases identified on Exhibits A and B) (ts) (ADI)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting the Motions filed in MDL 2327 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Substitute Susan M. Robinson as Counsel in lieu of David B. Thomas, and to Substitute William M. Gage as Counsel in lieu of Christy D. Jones; the Clerk is directed to terminate Christy D. Jones and to substitute William M. Gage as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which Christy D. Jones is associated, and to terminate David B. Thomas and to substitute Susan M. Robinson as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which David B. Thomas is associated. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/24/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (lca) (ADI)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER The deadline to submit joint motions of dismissal is extended to 10/31/2018 for all cases in MDL 2327 currently on an inactive docket. All remaining provisions of Inactive Docket Orders entered in MDL 2327 and individual cases remain in effect. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/15/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases on inactive docket) (klc) (ADI)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRETRIAL ORDER # 298 FIRST AMENDED ORDER REGARDING DISPOSITION OF NON-REVISION GYNECARE TVT PRODUCTS CASES This amended order revises certain future deadlines and addresses filing instructions regarding the Ethicon Election Form; the Order has been amended at paragraphs 2-5, paragraph 8(B)-(H), and Exhibit B; however, the remainder of this Order is substantively identical to PTO No. 293; if a plaintiff has already filed her Ethicon Election Form pursuant to the deadlines imposed by PTO No. 293, she is not required to re-file an Election Form; if an Election Form has not been filed it must be filed in each individual member case no later than 7/10/2018. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/15/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on the Second Amended Exhibit A) (kp) (ADI)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER (CHANGE TO CHARACTERIZATION BY CLERK'S OFFICE OF CASES ON INACTIVE DOCKET) It is directed that in all cases with an inactive docket order which resulted in "Closed" and "MDL Ethicon Inactive" flags on the docket sheet, the Clerk is directed to update the docket by removing the "Closed" flag from the docket sheet and leaving the "MDL Ethicon Inactive" flag, for reasons set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/26/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Member Cases Flagged "Closed" and "MDL Ethicon Inactive") (lca) (ADI)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRETRIAL ORDER # 293 ORDER REGARDING DISPOSITION OF NON-REVISION GYNECARE TVT PRODUCTS CASES The Motion filed at ECF No. 5313 in MDL 2327 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Order Regarding Disposition of Non-Revision Gynecare TVT Products Cases is GRANTED; each Non-Revised Plaintiff identified on the Second Amended Exhibit "A", together with any of her derivative plaintiffs with an existing MDL lawsuit, shall file an election form (Exhibit B to this Order) in each individual case no later than 6/10/2018; the deadlines for discovery and trial preparation procedures are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/11/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on the Second Amended Exhibit A) (mek) (ADI)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER The deadline to submit joint motions of dismissal is extended to 8/31/2018 for all cases in MDL 2327 currently on an inactive docket. All remaining provisions of Inactive Docket Orders entered in MDL 2327 and individual cases remain in effect. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/16/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases on inactive docket) (lca) (ADI)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INACTIVE DOCKET ORDER Having been advised by counsel that in the cases listed on the attached Exhibit A, the plaintiffs and Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, and where named, Ethicon, LLC have agreed to a mutual stay of activity. The Court finds it unnecessary to conduct further proceedings or to keep these cases on the active docket and ORDERS as follows: 1) all discovery deadlines are continued until further order of the Court, 2) the Clerk is directed to retire each of the cases listed on the attached Exhibit A from the active docket, 3) any case listed on Exhibit A that has not been dismissed or does not have a motion to reinstate to the active docket filed with the court for consideration by 3/31/2018 will be reinstated to the active docket by order of the court with a shortened Docket Control Order. This Order is linked to the Proposed Inactive Docket Order filed at ECF No. 5045. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 11/20/2017. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (btm)
June 22, 2017 Filing 5 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Christal Fisher, Jeremy Fisher. (Nefzger, William)
November 28, 2016 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy)
November 2, 2016 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David)
August 30, 2016 Filing 2 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 235 (Order Scheduling Status Conference and Meetings in MDLs on September 13-14, 2016) entered on 07/20/2016 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (jk)
August 29, 2016 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-4836767. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (bw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fisher et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Fisher
Represented By: William D. Nefzger
Represented By: Sarah Beth Hackman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christal Fisher
Represented By: William D. Nefzger
Represented By: Sarah Beth Hackman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon Inc
Represented By: Susan M Robinson
Represented By: Christy D Jones
Represented By: Andrew David Tharp
Represented By: William M Gage
Represented By: Katie A. Fillmore
Represented By: David B Thomas
Represented By: Anita Modak-Truran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Susan M Robinson
Represented By: Christy D Jones
Represented By: Andrew David Tharp
Represented By: William M Gage
Represented By: Katie A. Fillmore
Represented By: David B Thomas
Represented By: Anita Modak-Truran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?