Lawson v. Hammers
Petitioner: Robert Lawson
Respondent: Justin Hammers
Not Classified By Court: Habeas Attorney General
Case Number: 1:2020cv01366
Filed: October 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Michael M Mihm
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2020 Reset Deadlines as to #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Responses due by 1/20/2021. (JS, ilcd)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: The Court has reviewed #7 Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petitioner's 2254 petition. Finding good cause has been shown, the Court GRANTS #7 Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time. Respondent must file his response on or before January 20, 2021. Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 12/10/2020. (NRL, ilcd)
December 10, 2020 Filing 7 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5.) by Respondent Justin Hammers. Responses due by 12/24/2020 (Ness, Mitchell)
December 2, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Mitchell Ness on behalf of Justin Hammers (Ness, Mitchell) (Main Document 6 replaced on 12/2/2020) (JS, ilcd).
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 11/25/2020. For the reasons stated above, Petitioners #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and #3 Motion to Request Counsel are DENIED. Respondent shall have twenty-one (21) days after service of this Order to show cause why said writ should not be granted. (See Full Order) (AEM, ilcd)
October 23, 2020 Filing 4 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by Robert Lawson (AEM, ilcd)
October 23, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Request Counsel by Petitioner Robert Lawson. Responses due by 11/6/2020 (AEM, ilcd)
October 23, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Robert Lawson. Responses due by 11/6/2020 (AEM, ilcd)
October 23, 2020 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 14626038856 (AEM, ilcd)
October 23, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5.), filed by Robert Lawson.(AEM, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawson v. Hammers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Habeas Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Justin Hammers
Represented By: Mitchell Ness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?