Wessing v. Cook Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: KELLY WESSING
Defendant: COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC and COOK GROUP INCORPORATED
Case Number: 1:2020cv01368
Filed: October 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Referring Judge: Sue E Myerscough
2 Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
3 Judge: James E Shadid
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2020 Remark: Case transferred from Illinois Central has been opened in Southern District of Indiana as case 1:20-cv-06271, filed 11/18/2020. (ME, ilcd)
November 17, 2020 Filing 3 Conditional Transfer Order entered by Clerk, MDL Panel, transferring this case to the Southern District of Indiana. This case is terminated. (ME, ilcd)
November 13, 2020 MDL Remark: CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-113) - 1 action(s) re: pldg. (1 in ILC/1:20-cv-01368, 758 in MDL No. 2570) Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 11/13/2020.Associated Cases: MDL No. 2570, ILC/1:20-cv-01368 (DP) (TK, ilcd)
November 13, 2020 MDL Remark: MINUTE ORDER - TO INVOLVED CLERKS - Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-113) Finalized on 11/13/20. Please see pleading (3 in ILC/1:20-cv-01368, 765 in MDL No. 2570).As stipulated in Rule 7.1(c) of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transmittal of the order has been stayed 7 days to give any party an opportunity to oppose the transfer.The 7-day period has now elapsed, no opposition was received, and the order is directed to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the S.D. Indiana for filing. The Panel governing statute, 28 U.S.C. 1407, requires that the transferee clerk transmit a certified copy of the Panel order to transfer to the clerk of the district court from which the action is being transferred.Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 11/13/2020.Associated Cases: MDL No. 2570, ILC/1:20-cv-01368 (DP) (TK, ilcd)
October 27, 2020 Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins added as Referral Judge. (SKN, ilcd)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: The allegations of the Complaint #1 include that the Plaintiff is a resident of Montgomery County, Illinois, that Defendant Cook Group Incorporated does business in Sangamon and Montgomery Counties in Illinois, and that the Cook Defendants' Cook filter was marketed, sold, and implanted in Sangamon County, Illinois. While both Montgomery County and Sangamon County are in the Springfield Division of the U.S. District Court for the Central District of Illinois, the Plaintiff filed her Complaint in the Peoria Division. The Clerk is directed to TRANSFER this case to the Springfield Division of the U.S. District Court for the Central District of Illinois. See CDIL-LR 40.1(B). Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 10/27/2020. (KZ, ilcd)
October 26, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical LLC. (VH, ilcd)
October 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical LLC (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0753-3506627), filed by Kelly Wessing. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Flowers, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wessing v. Cook Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK GROUP INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KELLY WESSING
Represented By: Peter John Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?