AGCS Marine Insurance Co as subrogee of ASCO Power Technologies LP v. Chillicothe Metal Company Inc et al
Plaintiff: AGCS Marine Insurance Co as subrogee of ASCO Power Technologies LP
Defendant: Transport Logistics Inc, Transport National LLC and Chillicothe Metal Company Inc
Case Number: 1:2020cv01388
Filed: November 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Referring Judge: James E Shadid
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Chillicothe Metal Company Inc.(Lubben, David)
December 21, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by David G Lubben on behalf of Chillicothe Metal Company Inc (Lubben, David)
December 21, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Chillicothe Metal Company Inc. (Lubben, David)
December 14, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Transport National, LLC on 12/07/2020, filed by AGCS Marine Insurance Co as subrogee of ASCO Power Technologies LP. (Pilja, George)
December 14, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Transport Logistics, Inc. on 12/07/2020, filed by AGCS Marine Insurance Co as subrogee of ASCO Power Technologies LP. (Pilja, George)
December 9, 2020 Filing 8 Exhibit re #1 Complaint, by AGCS Marine Insurance Co as subrogee of ASCO Power Technologies LP. (VH, ilcd)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to File. Clerk is directed to file the Exhibit to Complaint which is incorporated in the motion at pages 4-9. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 12/8/20. (WG, ilcd)
December 7, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to File instanter, Exhibit A to Complaint by Plaintiff AGCS Marine Insurance Co as subrogee of ASCO Power Technologies LP. Responses due by 12/21/2020 (Pilja, George)
December 4, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Chillicothe Metal Company on 12/03/2020, filed by AGCS Marine Insurance Co as subrogee of ASCO Power Technologies LP. (Pilja, George)
November 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by George D Pilja on behalf of AGCS Marine Insurance Co as subrogee of ASCO Power Technologies LP (Pilja, George)
November 6, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Chillicothe Metal Company Inc, Transport Logistics Inc, Transport National LLC. (VH, ilcd)
November 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Michael L Foran on behalf of AGCS Marine Insurance Co as subrogee of ASCO Power Technologies LP (Foran, Michael)
November 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE Plaintiffs Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Foran, Michael)
November 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3516921.), filed by AGCS Marine Insurance Co as subrogee of ASCO Power Technologies LP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Chillicothe Metal Company Inc, #3 Summons to Transport Logistics Inc, #4 Summons to Transport Nationall LLC)(Foran, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AGCS Marine Insurance Co as subrogee of ASCO Power Technologies LP v. Chillicothe Metal Company Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transport Logistics Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transport National LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chillicothe Metal Company Inc
Represented By: David G Lubben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AGCS Marine Insurance Co as subrogee of ASCO Power Technologies LP
Represented By: Michael L Foran
Represented By: George D Pilja
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?