Fly et al v. Warden FCI Pekin
Petitioner: Toni Fly, William Anthony Fly and Emily Lau
Respondent: USA and Warden of FCI Pekin
Case Number: 1:2020cv01412
Filed: November 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION Imminent Danger with Tooth by Petitioner Toni Fly. Responses due by 1/26/2021 (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (TC, ilcd)
January 12, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Petitioner Toni Fly. Responses due by 1/26/2021. (TC, ilcd)
January 12, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Petitioner Toni Fly. Responses due by 1/26/2021. (TC, ilcd)
January 12, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Petitioner Toni Fly. Responses due by 1/26/2021. (TC, ilcd)
January 12, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Petitioner Toni Fly. Responses due by 1/26/2021. (TC, ilcd)
January 12, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Petitioner Toni Fly. Responses due by 1/26/2021. (TC, ilcd)
January 12, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Admit Evidence by Petitioner Toni Fly. Responses due by 1/26/2021. (TC, ilcd)
January 11, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Reconsideration re #5 Order Dismissing Case,, by Petitioner Toni Fly. Responses due by 1/25/2021. (TC, ilcd)
December 28, 2020 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable, re #6 , #5 . Mail sent to Emily Lau. (TC, ilcd)
December 14, 2020 Filing 6 JUDGMENT entered. (TC, ilcd) (Main Document 6 replaced on 12/14/2020) (TC, ilcd).
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 12/14/20. Emily Lau is terminated as a Petitioner. The Warden of FCI Pekin is substituted for the United States as Respondent. The Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus under 28 U.S.C. Section 2241 #1 is SUMMARILY DISMISSED. Petitioner's claims regarding her conditions of confinement are dismissed without prejudice. Petitioner's claims collaterally attacking her conviction and sentence are dismissed with prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 2255(e). This case is terminated. See written Order. (TC, ilcd)
November 25, 2020 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Southern; Case Number 3:20-cv-01259. .
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Case transferred to Central District of Illinois. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 11/24/2020. (drr)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE AND ORDER: The Court has received your Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Your case number is 20-1259-NJR. Within 30 days of the entry of this Order, you are ORDERED to submit the $5.00 filing fee or a motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. If you file a motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee, the Court must review your trust fund account statement for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of this action. Thus, you must have the Trust Fund Officer at your facility complete the attached certification and provide a copy of your trust fund account statement (or institutional equivalent). If you fail to pay the filing fee or submit the motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee by the deadline, the case will be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. FED. R. CIV. P. 41(b); Sperow v. Melvin, 153 F.3d 780, 781 (7th Cir. 1998). All mail should be sent to: Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, IL 62201. Finally, you are advised that if your address changes, you must notify the Court within seven days of the change by filing a Notice of Change of Address. Failure to do so could result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 11/20/2020. (jaj)
November 20, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Toni Fly, Emily Lau. (Attachments: #1 Petition part 2, #2 Envelope)(jaj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fly et al v. Warden FCI Pekin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Toni Fly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William Anthony Fly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Emily Lau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: W. Scott Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden of FCI Pekin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?