State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company v. Williams et al
Plaintiff: State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Matthew D. Williams doing business as Jandi Services, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Scott L. Sparks, Matthew D Williams doing business as Jandi Services and Scott L Sparks
Case Number: 1:2020cv01420
Filed: December 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Eric I Long
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Initial Disclosure due by 2/28/2021. (DS, ilcd)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 1/20/2021. Pursuant to Central District of Illinois Amended General Order 20-01, In Re: COVID-19 Public Emergency, the court hereby vacates the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 2/8/21. The court adopts the deadlines in the Parties' Agreed Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting #17 . The following deadlines are set: initial disclosures due 2/28/21, amended pleadings and joinder of parties due 9/1/21, Plaintiff's deadline to disclose experts and provide expert reports is 10/1/21, Plaintiff shall make experts available for deposition by 11/1/21, Defendant's deadline to disclose experts and provide expert reports is 12/1/21, Defendant shall make experts available for deposition by 1/3/22, discovery closes 3/1/22, case dispositive motions due 3/31/22. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/7/22 at 10:30 AM, before Judge Colin S. Bruce, Courtroom A, Urbana. Jury Trial set for 10/25/22 at 9:00 AM, before Judge Colin S. Bruce, Courtroom A, Urbana. The court stresses the importance of adhering to the schedule and procedures for requests to extend the schedule. The parties are reminded of option of Court sponsored mediation/Settlement Conference. The Court directs the Clerk to provide the parties with a copy of the Court's consent to magistrate judge form. A telephone status conference is set for 4/1/21 at 10:15 AM, before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. The Court will initiate the call. (DS, ilcd)
January 19, 2021 Filing 17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Reitz, Kurt)
January 14, 2021 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Plaintiff State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Chemers, Robert)
January 11, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Jonathan L Federman on behalf of State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Federman, Jonathan)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 1/11/2021. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 2/8/2021 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom B in Urbana before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. See written Order.(DS, ilcd)
January 7, 2021 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Reitz, Kurt)
January 7, 2021 Filing 12 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Reitz, Kurt)
January 7, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Reitz, Kurt)
January 7, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Kurt E Reitz on behalf of Norfolk Southern Railway Company (Reitz, Kurt)
January 5, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Jerrold H Stocks on behalf of Matthew D Williams (Stocks, Jerrold)
January 5, 2021 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Matthew D Williams. (Stocks, Jerrold)
January 5, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Matthew D Williams. Responses due by 1/19/2021 (Stocks, Jerrold)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 1/5/2021. Per the Court's Text Order on 12/16/20, Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss #5 is GRANTED. (DS, ilcd)
December 22, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company. Matthew D Williams served on 12/16/2020, answer due 1/6/2021. (Chemers, Robert)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 12/16/2020. Pursuant to Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss #5 and Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Defendant Scott L. Sparks is hereby terminated. This case remains pending as to the other Defendants. (DS, ilcd)
December 15, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION TO VOLUNTARILY DISMISS CERTAIN DEFENDANT by Plaintiff State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company. Responses due by 12/29/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chemers, Robert)
December 4, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Matthew D Williams and returned to counsel for service. (DS, ilcd)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: The Plaintiff filed its Complaint #1 in the Peoria Division of the U.S. District Court for the Central District of Illinois. It appears the Complaint was inadvertently filed in the Peoria Division as the caption of the case indicates the Urbana Division and the allegations include that one Defendant resides in or near Macon, Illinois and the underlying Claimant resides in or near Macon County, Illinois. The Clerk is therefore directed to TRANSFER this case to the Urbana Division of the U.S. District Court for the Central District of Illinois. See CDIL-LR 40.1(D) ("All complaints and subsequent filings in cases which arise from the following counties:... Macon... will be filed at URBANA, ILLINOIS"). Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 12/3/2020. (KZ, ilcd)
December 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Robert M Chemers on behalf of State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Chemers, Robert)
December 3, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Chemers, Robert)
December 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0753-3536371.), filed by State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Exhibit B - 9-13-18 Letter from Norfolk to Williams, #3 Exhibit C - 10-4-18 Letter from Phipps at Downs Agency, #4 Exhibit D - Services Contract between Norfolk and Williams, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons)(Chemers, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew D. Williams doing business as Jandi Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Represented By: Kurt E Reitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott L. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew D Williams doing business as Jandi Services
Represented By: Jerrold H Stocks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott L Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert M Chemers
Represented By: Jonathan L Federman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?