Adams v. Warden, FCI Pekin
Petitioner: Michael M Adams
Respondent: Warden, FCI Pekin
Case Number: 1:2020cv01424
Filed: December 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: James E Shadid
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2020 Filing 5 Letter to the Clerk from Petitioner Michael Adams. (JS, ilcd)
December 22, 2020 Filing 4 JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL CASE. (JS, ilcd)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 12/21/2020. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED: Petitioner Michael Adams' Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus under 28 U.S.C. 2241 (d/e #1 ) is SUMMARILY DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255(e). Petitioner's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (d/e #2 ) is DENIED. The Clerk is directed to prepare the judgment and CLOSE the case. SEE FULL WRITTEN ORDER.(JS, ilcd)
December 14, 2020 Filing fee: $5.00, receipt number 14626039257. (JS, ilcd)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 12/8/2020. Petitioner has filed a Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 but has not paid the $5 filing fee. Petitioner is DIRECTED to either pay the $5 filing fee or provide the Court with a signed Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs that also includes a copy of his trust fund ledger, certified by the appropriate institutional officer, showing all receipts, expenditures and balances for the last six months. Petitioner shall do so on or before January 8, 2021, or the Court will dismiss the case without prejudice for failure to pay the filing fee. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send Petitioner a copy of the forms for proceeding in forma pauperis. (JS, ilcd)
December 7, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Petitioner Michael M Adams. Responses due by 12/21/2020 (JS, ilcd)
December 7, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Michael M Adams. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Petition, #2 Envelope)(JS, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. Warden, FCI Pekin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden, FCI Pekin
Represented By: W. Scott Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael M Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?