Beaudry v. Blick Art Materials
Plaintiff: Cory L Beaudry
Defendant: Blick Art Materials
Case Number: 1:2020cv01440
Filed: December 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara Darrow
Referring Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Proposed Summons filed by Cory L Beaudry. (JRK, ilcd)
January 19, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Cory L Beaudry. Responses due by 2/2/2021 (JRK, ilcd)
January 19, 2021 Filing 2 PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Cory L Beaudry.(JRK, ilcd)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: The allegations of the Complaint #1 include that the discrimination the Plaintiff complains of occurred in Galesburg, Illinois which is in Knox County, Illinois. Knox County is within the Rock Island Division of the U.S. District Court for the Central District of Illinois. Yet the Plaintiff filed his Complaint in the Peoria Division of the Central District of Illinois. The Clerk is therefore directed to TRANSFER this case to the Rock Island Division of the U.S. District Court for the Central District of Illinois. See CDIL-LR 40.1(C) ("All complaints and subsequent filings in cases which arise from the following counties:... Knox... will be filed at ROCK ISLAND, ILLINOIS"). Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 12/21/2020. (KZ, ilcd)
December 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Blick Art Materials filed by Cory L Beaudry. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(FDS, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beaudry v. Blick Art Materials
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blick Art Materials
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cory L Beaudry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?