Ware v. United States of America
Petitioner: Robert Ware
Respondent: Jon Sandage
Case Number: 1:2021cv01010
Filed: January 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: James E Shadid
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2021 Filing 7 JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL CASE. (FDS, ilcd)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 2/16/21. Petitioner's letter #1 is DISMISSED AS MOOT in light of Petitioner's Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. Petitioner's Amended Petition #4 is SUMMARILY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Finally, as Petitioner has paid the $5.00 filing fee for this case, his Motion to proceed in forma paupers #5 is DISMISSED AS MOOT. This case is CLOSED. SEE FULL WRITTEN ORDER. (FDS, ilcd)
February 12, 2021 Filing fee: $5.00, receipt number 14626039887. (JS, ilcd)
February 8, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Robert Ware. Responses due by 2/22/2021 (FDS, ilcd)
February 8, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) filed by Robert Ware.(FDS, ilcd)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Petitioner's Motion #3 for Status and Forms is GRANTED. Petitioner appears to have mailed his motion prior to receiving a copy of the Courts January 11, 2021 Order. The Court's previous Order provided Petitioner with instructions on how to proceed with his 2241 Petition and a blank 2241 form was sent along with this order. Petitioner additionally seeks copies of the standard complaint form for a section 1983 civil suit. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send Petitioner one copy of the standard complaint form with instructions and a petition to proceed in forma pauperis form. Entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 1/21/21. (FDS, ilcd)
January 19, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION Status and Copies of Forms by Petitioner Robert Ware. Responses due by 2/2/2021 (FDS, ilcd)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 1/11/2021. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED: If Petitioner wishes to pursue a Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus under 28 U.S.C. 2241, he must file a Petition that clearly lays out his claims for relief. Additionally, Petitioner must pay the $5 filing fee or provide the Court with a signed Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs that also includes a copy of his trust fund ledger, certified by the appropriate institutional officer, showing all receipts, expenditures and balances for the last six months. Petitioner must do so within thirty (30) days of this Order or the Court will dismiss his Petition without prejudice for failure to prosecute. If Petitioner seeks relief other than release from detention, he may not pursue it in a habeas action. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send Petitioner a blank 2241 Form and Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. (AEM, ilcd)
January 4, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) filed by Robert Ware. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(FDS, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ware v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jon Sandage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?