Theus v. Grissom
Petitioner: Delvecchio Theus
Respondent: A.W. Grissom
Case Number: 1:2021cv01012
Filed: January 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Michael M Mihm
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2021 Filing 3 JUDGMENT entered. (VH, ilcd)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER AND OPINION entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 2/17/2021. For the reasons stated above, Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus under 29 U.S.C. 2241 #1 is DISMISSED. This case is now TERMINATED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to close this case. See full written Order.(VH, ilcd)
February 9, 2021 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 14626039844 (AH, ilcd)
January 11, 2021 Set Deadline: Deficiencies to be remedied by 2/10/2021. (VH, ilcd)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 1/11/2021 directing the Petitioner to pay the filing fee of $5.00 within 30 days of this Order. If Petitioner is unable to pay the required filing fee, he may file a Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. If Petitioner fails to pay the required filing fee or file a Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis within 30 days, his #1 Petition under 28 U.S.C. 2241 for Writ of Habeas will be dismissed without prejudice by this Court. Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 1/11/2021. (NRL, ilcd)
January 7, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Delvecchio Theus.(VH, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Theus v. Grissom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Delvecchio Theus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: A.W. Grissom
Represented By: W. Scott Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?