Peters v. Peters
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Peters
Defendant: Arthur C Peters
Case Number: 1:2021cv01017
Filed: January 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Referring Judge: James E Shadid
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2021 Filing 2 JUDGMENT entered. (VH)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER: Plaintiff was granted multiple opportunities to set forth the jurisdictional basis for her claims. She has failed to do so. Therefore, this action is dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The Clerk is directed to close the case. Entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 3/3/2021. (SJP)
February 17, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/2/2021. (FDS, ilcd)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: On 1/14/2021, the Court entered a Text Order noting that the allegations in the Plaintiff's "Criminal Court Complaint" did not provide a basis for federal jurisdiction. The Court directed the Plaintiff to set out the basis for this Court's jurisdiction over the subject matter of this dispute by 2/4/2021. She did not do so. The Court sua sponte extends the Plaintiff's deadline to set out the basis for this Court's jurisdiction over the subject matter of this dispute to 3/2/2021. Plaintiff's failure to do so may result in dismissal of this case. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 2/16/2021. (KZ, ilcd)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: The Court has reviewed the Plaintiff's "Criminal Court Complaint" #1 . The Complaint's allegations do not provide a basis for federal jurisdiction. "[P]rivate parties may not pursue claims under federal criminal statutes." Norman v. Campbell, 87 F. App'x 582, 584 (7th Cir. 2003) (unpublished opinion). "Federal courts are courts of limited jurisdiction. They possess only that power authorized by Constitution and statute[.]" Kokkonen v. Guardian Life Ins. Co. of Am., 511 U.S. 375, 377 (1994). The general grants of federal jurisdiction appear in 28 U.S.C. 1331 (federal question) and 28 U.S.C. 1332 (diversity of citizenship). In general, the party invoking federal jurisdiction bears the burden to demonstrate its existence. Hart v. FedEx Ground Package Sys., Inc., 457 F.3d 675, 679 (7th Cir. 2006) (citing Steel Co. v. Citizens for a Better Env't, 523 U.S. 83, 104 (1998)). Therefore, the Plaintiff is directed to set out the basis for this Court's jurisdiction over the subject matter of this dispute by 2/4/2021. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 1/14/2021. (KZ, ilcd)
January 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Arthur C Peters, filed by Elizabeth Peters.(TK, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peters v. Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur C Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?