Cullum v. Hinthorne
Petitioner: Detrick Cullum
Respondent: Cherryle Hinthorne
Case Number: 1:2021cv01041
Filed: January 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Joe Billy McDade
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2021 Filing 5 JUDGMENT in a Civil Case. (AEM, ilcd) (Main Document 5 replaced on 2/8/2021) (AEM, ilcd).
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 2/5/2021.IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #1 is DISMISSED for want of subject matter jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. 2244 and the Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis #2 is DENIED AS MOOT. CASE TERMINATED. (AEM, ilcd)
January 28, 2021 Filing 3 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by Detrick Cullum (AEM, ilcd)
January 28, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Detrick Cullum. Responses due by 2/11/2021 (AEM, ilcd)
January 28, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Detrick Cullum.(AEM, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cullum v. Hinthorne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Detrick Cullum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Cherryle Hinthorne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?