Chandler v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Ellen Chandler
Defendant: C R Bard Inc and Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc
Case Number: 1:2021cv01069
Filed: February 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Referring Judge: Michael M Mihm
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2021 Remark: This case has been opened in the NDIL as case 1:21-cv-01222. (TK)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's #1 Complaint for damages which is a part of a multidistrict litigation proceeding involving personal injury cases against Defendants C. R. Bard, Inc. and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. The Plaintiff received implants from the Defendants in Rockford, Illinois, and claim they are defective. Due to neither Defendant residing in the Central District of Illinois and a substantial part of the events or omissions giving rise to the claim occurring in Rockford, Illinois, the Clerk is DIRECTED to transfer Plaintiff's case to the Northern District of Illinois. Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 2/25/21. (TK)
February 25, 2021 Case transferred to the Northern District of Illinois. Case was electronically submitted to transferee court. (TK)
February 24, 2021 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:17-cv-02602. .
February 23, 2021 Remark: Transferring Case to the Central District of Illinois via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/11/2021. (MAP)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 *AMENDED By Doc. #4 *SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/9/2021. (MAP) *Modified on 2/17/2021 (MAP).
August 4, 2017 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-17-02602-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LSP)
August 4, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14507821 filed by Ellen Chandler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chandler v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellen Chandler
Represented By: William B Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Inc
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?