Davis v. Internal Revenue Service
Plaintiff: Javaughnna M. Davis
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 1:2021cv01098
Filed: March 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Referring Judge: James E Shadid
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER: Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion #5 to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim was due 4/28/2021. To date, Plaintiff has failed to Respond. The Court sua sponte extends Plaintiff's deadline to Respond to 5/21/2021. If Plaintiff fails to Respond by 5/21/2021, this case will be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 5/7/2021. (GN)
April 14, 2021 Filing 6 RULE 12(C) NOTICE entered re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (VH)
April 14, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Internal Revenue Service. Responses due by 4/28/2021 (Konig, Jordan)
April 6, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Jordan Andrew Konig on behalf of Internal Revenue Service (Konig, Jordan)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Internal Revenue Service answer deadline extended to 4/15/2021. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 3/26/21. (WG)
March 25, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Notice of Removal (Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint) by Defendant Internal Revenue Service. Responses due by 4/8/2021 (Sarnell, Bradley)
March 25, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Bradley Alexander Sarnell on behalf of Internal Revenue Service (Sarnell, Bradley)
March 18, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Peoria County Circuit Court, case number 21-SC-149 (), filed by Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hoff, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javaughnna M. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: David H Hoff
Represented By: Bradley Alexander Sarnell
Represented By: Jordan Andrew Konig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?