Guijosa-Maya v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Santiago Guijosa-Maya
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: CSS-Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2021cv01128
Filed: April 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Joe Billy McDade
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2021 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by Santiago Guijosa-Maya as to US Attorney General served 5/13/2021. (FDS)
April 27, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Commissioner of Social Security served on 4/27/2021, answer due 8/25/2021. (VH)
April 26, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Santiago Guijosa-Maya. Responses due by 5/10/2021 (Iden, Stephen)
April 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Santiago Guijosa-Maya. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Iden, Stephen)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 4/26/2021. Plaintiff is excused from paying the fees associated with this action. The Clerk shall deliver three copies of the Complaint, along with summons, to the United States Marshal, who is directed to serve it on Defendant in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i). Defendant shall file a responsive pleading within 120 days from the date of service. (EWL)
April 26, 2021 Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley no longer assigned to case. (VH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guijosa-Maya v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santiago Guijosa-Maya
Represented By: Stephen Douglas Iden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CSS-Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?