Donelson v. Jackson
Petitioner: Charles Donelson
Respondent: Leonta Jackson
Not Classified By Court: Habeas Attorney General
Case Number: 1:2021cv01130
Filed: April 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Joe Billy McDade
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 5/13/21. IT IS ORDERED: Petitioner's claim regarding the certification of his witness's statement is DISMISSED. Respondent SHALL file an answer, motion or other responsive pleading to the remaining claims within sixty (60) days of this Order. Respondent should address any facts that would establish whether Petitioner's claims are untimely or procedurally barred. In addition, Respondent should address the merits of Petitioner's constitutional claims and otherwise fully comply with Rule 5 of the Rules Governing 2254 Proceedings for the United States District Courts. SEE FULL WRITTEN ORDER. (FDS)
May 11, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE to the Court re Filing Fee Received. (VH)
May 10, 2021 Filing fee: $5.00, receipt number 24626010015. (DS)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 4/29/2021. The Court notes Petitioner has neither paid the applicable $5.00 filing fee nor submitted a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. The Court will postpone its requisite Rule 4 assessment of this Petition until Petitioner has either paid the filing fee or filed a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. If Petitioner does not either pay the filing fee or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis within twenty-eight (28) days of the date of this Order, this Petition will be dismissed for failure to prosecute. (EWL)
April 27, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus 2254, filed by Charles Donelson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(TK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Donelson v. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Charles Donelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Habeas Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Leonta Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?