Gharrett v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Kim Gharrett
Defendant: C R Bard Inc and Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc
Case Number: 1:2021cv01136
Filed: May 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Referring Judge: James E Shadid
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Per the filing of the #8 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Kim Gharrett, the status conference set 6/1/21 at 2:00 PM is VACATED. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 6/1/21. (WG)
May 26, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc. (Elster, Jason)
May 26, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Jason B Elster on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Elster, Jason)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #10 unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Richard B North, Jr terminated as counsel in this matter. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 5/26/21. (WG)
May 25, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Richard North, Jr. [Unopposed] by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc. Responses due by 6/8/2021 (Baier, Michael)
May 25, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Michael Thomas Baier on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Baier, Michael)
May 24, 2021 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Kim Gharrett. (Schulte, Steven)
May 18, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Steven S Schulte on behalf of Kim Gharrett (Schulte, Steven)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to the transfer of this case to the CDIL, a Status Conference is set for 6/1/2021 at 2:00 PM via telephone before Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley. Counsel are to phone into conference by calling 571-353-2300, then enter 287753270#. Please announce your name each time prior to speaking unless the judge asks a question directly to you so that the speaker may be identified by all. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 5/10/21. (WG)
May 7, 2021 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-03170. .
May 6, 2021 Remark: Transferring Case to the Central District of Illinois via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED FINAL SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 4/26/21. (MAP)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 *Amended by Doc. #4 --FINAL SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 4/20/21. (MAP) Modified on 4/29/2021 (SJF).
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16920407 filed by Kim Gharrett. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLQ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gharrett v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Gharrett
Represented By: Arati C Furness
Represented By: Matthew Ryan McCarley
Represented By: Steven S Schulte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Inc
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Jason B Elster
Represented By: Michael Thomas Baier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Jason B Elster
Represented By: Michael Thomas Baier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?