Toombs v. Gorman
Plaintiff: J T Toombs and JT Toombs
Defendant: Katherine Gorman
Case Number: 1:2021cv01146
Filed: May 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara Darrow
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2021 Filing 9 JUDGMENT entered. (KE)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MERIT REVIEW AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 6/16/2021. Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed for failure to state a claim pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and 28 U.S.C. Sec 1915A. Any amendment to the Complaint would be futile. This case is therefore terminated. All pending motions are denied as moot. The clerk is directed to enter a judgment pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 58. This dismissal may count as one of the plaintiff's three allotted "strikes" pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(g). The Clerk of the Court is directed to record Plaintiff's strike in the three-strike log. If Plaintiff wishes to appeal this dismissal, he must file a notice of appeal with this Court within 30 days of the entry of judgment. See written order. (KE)
June 10, 2021 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 24626010068. (BMG)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 5/20/2021. Plaintiff filed a Petition to Proceed in forma pauperis #3 . Plaintiff's trust fund ledgers disclose $1,722.60 in deposits over the past six months. During this time, Plaintiff spent approximately $1,500.00 at commissary. Plaintiff's petition #3 is DENIED. See Lumbert v. Ill. Dep't of Corrs., 827 F.2d 257, 260 (7th Cir. 1987) (a litigant who "thinks that a more worthwhile use of his funds would be to buy [commissary items] than to file a civil rights suit has demonstrated an implied evaluation of the suit that the district court is entitled to honor."). Plaintiff shall pay the $402.00 filing fee in full within 21 days of this Order. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of this case without prejudice. (KE)
May 19, 2021 Filing 7 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by JT Toombs (RES)
May 18, 2021 Filing 6 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by JT Toombs (RES)
May 14, 2021 Filing 5 Letter from Clerk's Office to East Moline Correctional Center Trust Fund Department requesting trust fund ledgers for JT Toombs. (KB)
May 12, 2021 Filing 4 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by J T Toombs (KB)
May 12, 2021 Filing 3 PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by J T Toombs.(KB)
May 12, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Chief Judge Sara Darrow. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Rock Island Division, 322 16th Street, Rock Island, IL 61201.Merit Review Deadline set for 6/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(KB)
May 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Katherine Gorman, filed by J T Toombs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (KB) (Main Document 1 replaced on 5/13/2021) (KB). Modified on 5/13/2021 to attach correct complaint(KB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Toombs v. Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J T Toombs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JT Toombs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?