Redden v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Desmond Harrell Redden
Defendant: Commissoner of Social Security and US Attorney General
Interested Party: CSS-Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2021cv01154
Filed: May 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Referring Judge: Michael M Mihm
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2021 Filing 4 Returned of Service Executed. US Attorney General served on 6/14/2021. (AH) Modified on 6/23/2021 to correct filing (AH).
June 2, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commissoner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Commissoner of Social Security served on 6/2/2021, answer due 9/30/2021. (VH)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis #2 . Plaintiff has filed a Petition to Proceed in forma pauperis #2 . In support of his application, Plaintiff states under penalty of perjury that he is unemployed, relies on food stamps, and lives with his sister. Accordingly, the Court finds that Plaintiff is unable to pay the applicable $400 filing fee. Plaintiff must also demonstrate that his Complaint is not frivolous or malicious. Plaintiff's Complaint does not detail the merits of his claim; however, it is clear he is seeking review of a final decision of the Commissioner of Social Security. The Complaint also provides Plaintiff has exhausted his administrative remedies. The Court finds Plaintiffs claim satisfies the requirement of not being frivolous or malicious. Therefore, Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis #2 is GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff is excused from paying the filing fee in this action. The Clerk SHALL execute service of initial process upon the United States Attorney and Social Security Administration under Fed. R. Civ.P. 4(i)(1)(A and C) and Local Rule 8.1 (C) by electronic delivery of the Summons and Complaint. The Clerk shall deliver copies of the Complaint, along with Summonses, to the United States Marshal, who is DIRECTED to serve them on the Attorney General pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(i)(1)(B). Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 6/2/2021. (VH)
May 24, 2021 Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley no longer assigned to case. (AH)
May 19, 2021 Filing 2 PETITION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Desmond Harrell Redden. Responses due by 6/2/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 USM for Attorney General, #3 USM for OGC, #4 USM for U.S. Attorney)(Osterhout, Karl)
May 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, filed by Desmond Harrell Redden. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summonses)(Osterhout, Karl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Redden v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissoner of Social Security
Represented By: US ATTY-PEORIA SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desmond Harrell Redden
Represented By: Karl E Osterhout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CSS-Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?