Mote v. Federal Bureau of Investigation et al
Plaintiff: Richard Scott Mote
Defendant: Normal Police Department, Drug Enforcement Administration, Bloomington Police Department, Wesly United Methodist Church and Federal Bureau of Investigation
Case Number: 1:2021cv01179
Filed: June 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Referring Judge: James E Shadid
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2021 Filing 4 JUDGMENT entered. (AH)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER: On 7/6/2021 the Court directed Plaintiff to file an amended complaint curing the deficiencies identified by the Court in its text order. Plaintiff submitted a document #3 in response to the Courts order, but that document does not address the issues identified by the Court. Accordingly, this case is dismissed for failure to prosecute. Alternatively, because Plaintiff seeks to proceed without prepayment of court costs, #2 , the Court would dismiss this action under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2) because it is frivolous. The Clerk is directed to close the case. Entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 8/2/2021. (SJP)
July 8, 2021 Filing 3 Exhibit re #1 Complaint by Richard Scott Mote. (FDS)
July 7, 2021 Set Deadline: Amended Pleadings due by 7/28/2021. (VH)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER: Plaintiff has filed a Complaint #1 and Motion #2 to Proceed in forma pauperis. However, the Complaint fails to list the addresses of many Defendants, is not set forth in separately numbered paragraphs (see Fed. R. Civ. P. 10(b)), and portions of the Complaint are illegible. Accordingly, the Court directs Plaintiff to file an amended complaint curing the defects identified above within 21 days of this Order. Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal of this lawsuit for failure to prosecute. Entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 7/6/2021. (SJP)
June 24, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Richard Scott Mote. Responses due by 7/8/2021 (TK)
June 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Richard Scott Mote.(TK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mote v. Federal Bureau of Investigation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Normal Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drug Enforcement Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bloomington Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wesly United Methodist Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Scott Mote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?