Gruver et al v. Montesa et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Gruver and Karri Gruver
Defendant: Rex Montesa, Nolasco Montessa, Anthony Dunn, Montessa Express Inc, Pinoy Trucking, Inc., Rex Express, Inc. and Tennessee Commercial Warehouse Inc
Case Number: 1:2021cv01210
Filed: July 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Referring Judge: Joe Billy McDade
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2021 Filing 27 Tennessee Commercial Warehouse Inc's ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by Tennessee Commercial Warehouse Inc.(Ryan, William)
September 21, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by William P Ryan on behalf of Tennessee Commercial Warehouse Inc (Ryan, William)
September 21, 2021 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Tennessee Commercial Warehouse Inc. (Ryan, William)
September 21, 2021 Filing 24 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by William P Ryan on behalf of Tennessee Commercial Warehouse Inc. (Ryan, William)
September 15, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Morgan Adams on behalf of Karri Gruver, Timothy Gruver (Adams, Morgan)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER ORDER STRIKING/VACATING DOCUMENT: #22 Notice of Appearance of Attorney filed by Karri Gruver, Timothy Gruver entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 9/15/2021. It appears Attorney Morgan Adams erroneously entered an appearance using the account of another attorney. That Notice of Appearance is therefore stricken. However, this issue seems to have been corrected by the subsequent filing of a proper Notice of Appearance #23 , so no further action need be taken on this particular issue. (EWL)
September 14, 2021 Filing 22 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO TEXT ORDER ENTERED ON 9/15/2021-NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Danny R. Ellis on behalf of Karri Gruver, Timothy Gruver (Ellis, Danny) Modified on 9/16/2021 (VH).
September 14, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Danny R. Ellis on behalf of Karri Gruver, Timothy Gruver (Ellis, Danny)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Pinoy Trucking, Inc. responsive pleading is due 11/1/2021. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 9/14/21. (WG)
September 13, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer AND TO FILE ITS LOCAL RULE 11.3 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST by Defendant Pinoy Trucking, Inc.. Responses due by 9/27/2021 (Poulakidas, Mark)
September 13, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Mark G Poulakidas on behalf of Pinoy Trucking, Inc. (Poulakidas, Mark)
September 13, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance of MDL Attorney by Lew R C Bricker on behalf of Rex Montesa, Rex Express, Inc. (Bricker, Lew)
September 13, 2021 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Timothy Gruver. Montessa Express Inc served on 9/8/2021, answer due 9/29/2021. (Green, Jeffrey)
September 13, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Timothy Gruver. Nolasco Montessa served on 9/8/2021, answer due 9/29/2021. (Green, Jeffrey)
September 10, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Timothy Gruver. (Green, Jeffrey)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or otherwise plead and to file their Local Rule 11.3 Certificate of interest. Deadline extended to 10/22/2021. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 9/8/21. (WG)
September 7, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Timothy Gruver. Pinoy Trucking, Inc. served on 8/25/2021, answer due 9/15/2021. (Green, Jeffrey)
September 7, 2021 Filing 13 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Local Rule 11.3 Certificate of Interest by Defendant Rex Montesa. Responses due by 9/21/2021 (Barnes, Michael)
September 7, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Michael Barnes on behalf of Rex Montesa (Barnes, Michael)
September 7, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Timothy Gruver. Tennessee Commercial Warehouse Inc served on 9/1/2021, answer due 9/22/2021. (Green, Jeffrey)
August 30, 2021 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Rex Montesa on 08/25/2021, filed by Timothy Gruver. (Green, Jeffrey)
August 25, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Timothy Gruver as to Anthony Dunn. (Green, Jeffrey)
August 24, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Tennessee Commercial Warehouse Inc. (FDS)
August 24, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Timothy Gruver. Tennessee Commercial Warehouse Inc served on 8/17/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (Green, Jeffrey)
August 24, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Timothy Gruver. Rex Express, Inc. served on 8/17/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (Green, Jeffrey)
August 2, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Karri Gruver, Timothy Gruver.(Green, Jeffrey)
July 30, 2021 Set Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/12/2021. (VH)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re subject matter jurisdiction. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 7/29/2021. (KZ)
July 28, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (FDS)
July 28, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Karri Gruver, Timothy Gruver. (TK)
July 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILCDC-3721848.), filed by Timothy Gruver. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement)(Green, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gruver et al v. Montesa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Gruver
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Green
Represented By: Danny R. Ellis
Represented By: Morgan Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karri Gruver
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Green
Represented By: Danny R. Ellis
Represented By: Morgan Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rex Montesa
Represented By: Lew R C Bricker
Represented By: Michael Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nolasco Montessa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montessa Express Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinoy Trucking, Inc.
Represented By: Mark G Poulakidas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rex Express, Inc.
Represented By: Lew R C Bricker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tennessee Commercial Warehouse Inc
Represented By: William P Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?