Estrada v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Uriel N. Estrada
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: CSS-Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2021cv01298
Filed: October 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Referring Judge: James E Shadid
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2021 Text Only Order by U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley: Respondent to file a transcript along with its responsive pleading to the Complaint per Civil LR 8.1(D). Transcript, including scanned documents, must be OCRd so that it is text searchable in its entirety. Entered on 12/8/21. (WG)
November 30, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Uriel N. Estrada. Commissioner of Social Security served on 11/15/2021, answer due 3/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt, #2 Certified Mail Receipt, #3 Certified Mail Receipt)(Binder, Charles)
October 21, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (VH)
October 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILCDC-3787990.), filed by Uriel N. Estrada. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 summons, #3 summons, #4 summons)(Binder, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estrada v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uriel N. Estrada
Represented By: Charles E Binder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CSS-Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?