Banker Barnett v. Heinlen et al
Plaintiff: Derek J Banker Barnett
Defendant: Lynn J Heinlen and Heinlen Trucking LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv01310
Filed: October 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Referring Judge: Michael M Mihm
2 Judge: Richard Mills
3 Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The Parties' Agreed Motion to Remand to State Court d/e #4 is GRANTED. This case is remanded to the Circuit Court of the Seventh Judicial Circuit, Sangamon County, Illinois. The Clerk will terminate this case. See written Order. Entered by Senior District Judge Richard Mills on 11/30/2021. (SKN)
November 11, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Defendants Lynn J Heinlen, Heinlen Trucking LLC. Responses due by 11/26/2021 (Pratt, Tyler)
November 11, 2021 Filing 3 STIPULATION and Agreement that Amount in Controversy Does Not Exceed $75,000 by Lynn J Heinlen, Heinlen Trucking LLC.. (Pratt, Tyler)
November 4, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Tyler J Pratt on behalf of Lynn J Heinlen, Heinlen Trucking LLC (Pratt, Tyler)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: It appears that counsel for the Defendants inadvertently filed the Notice of Removal #1 in the Peoria Division of this Court. The Notice of Removal identifies the Springfield Division in the caption, and the body of the Notice provides that this case is being removed from the Circuit Court of the Seventh Judicial Circuit, Sangamon County, Illinois. Accordingly, the Clerk is directed to TRANSFER this case to the Springfield Division of this Court. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 10/29/2021. (KZ)
October 28, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sangamon County, case number 2021L158 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILCDC-3793508), filed by Heinlen Trucking LLC, Lynn J Heinlen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Hefflefinger, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banker Barnett v. Heinlen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek J Banker Barnett
Represented By: Todd L Lindquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn J Heinlen
Represented By: Matthew S Hefflefinger
Represented By: Tyler J Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heinlen Trucking LLC
Represented By: Matthew S Hefflefinger
Represented By: Tyler J Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?