Broadcast Music et al v. Pink Pig et al
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music Inc, Songs of Universal Inc, Get Loose Music Inc, Kings Road Music, Sony ATV Songs LLC doing business as Sony ATV Acuff Rose Music, R-Key Darkus Publishing, Orbi-Lee Publishing, Roys Boys LLC, Stone Diamond Music Corp, Combine Music Corp, BMG Rights Management (US) LLC doing business as BMG Bumblebee, Windswept Holdings LLC doing business as Songs of Windswept Pacific, Robert Cray Music Inc, Painted Desert Music Corporation, 3Ring Circus Music LLC doing business as Soulride Music, Round Hill Music LP doing business as Round Hill Works, Cackalacki Twang, Warner Tamerlane Publishing Corp, Eleksylum Music Inc, No Surrender Music, Sony ATV Songs LLC doing business as Sony ATV Tree Publishing, Carnival Music Company doing business as Tiltawhirl Music and Pink Dog Publishing
Defendant: Pink Pig Inc doing business as The Pink Pig, Victor Fuentes and Traci Lipps
Case Number: 1:2022cv01310
Filed: September 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Eric I Long
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 11/1/2022. This matter is scheduled for a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference by personal appearance on 12/1/2022 at 9:45 AM in Courtroom B in Urbana before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. See written Order. (BMG)
October 31, 2022 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Victor Fuentes, Traci Lipps, Pink Pig Inc.(Murphy, Joseph)
October 25, 2022 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Jason Stephens, Reg. Agent for Pink Pig Inc. dba The Pink Pig on 10/11/22, filed by 3Ring Circus Music LLC, BMG Rights Management (US) LLC, Broadcast Music Inc, Cackalacki Twang, Carnival Music Company, Combine Music Corp, Eleksylum Music Inc, Get Loose Music Inc, Kings Road Music, No Surrender Music, Orbi-Lee Publishing, Painted Desert Music Corporation, Pink Dog Publishing, R-Key Darkus Publishing, Robert Cray Music Inc, Round Hill Music LP, Roys Boys LLC, Songs of Universal Inc, Sony ATV Songs LLC, Sony ATV Songs LLC, Stone Diamond Music Corp, Warner Tamerlane Publishing Corp, Windswept Holdings LLC. (Menold, Noah)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 10/24/2022. Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #11 is GRANTED. Defendants' deadline to file their Answer is extended to 10/31/22.(BMG)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 10/24/2022. Plaintiff's Motion to Strike #12 is GRANTED. The Court directs the Clerk to strike #7 Certificate of Service, #8 Certificate of Service, and #9 Certificate of Service from the docket. (BMG)
October 21, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Strike #9 Certificate of Service, #7 Certificate of Service, #8 Certificate of Service by Plaintiff Broadcast Music Inc. Responses due by 11/4/2022 (Menold, Noah)
October 21, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, by Defendants Victor Fuentes, Traci Lipps, Pink Pig Inc. Responses due by 11/4/2022 (Murphy, Joseph)
October 21, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Joseph D Murphy on behalf of All Defendants (Murphy, Joseph)
October 20, 2022 Filing 9 ***STRICKEN*** CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Broadcast Music Inc Request For Admission (Menold, Noah) Modified on 10/24/2022 to show STRICKEN(BMG).
October 20, 2022 Filing 8 ***STRICKEN*** CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Broadcast Music Inc Plaintiff's Initial Discovery Disclosures (Menold, Noah) Modified on 10/24/2022 to show STRICKEN(BMG).
October 20, 2022 Filing 7 ***STRICKEN*** CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Broadcast Music Inc Plaintiff's First Set of Request For Production of Documents to Defendants and First Set of Interrogatories to Defendants (Menold, Noah) Modified on 10/24/2022 to show STRICKEN (BMG).
October 11, 2022 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Traci Lipps on 10/06/22, filed by Broadcast Music Inc. (Menold, Noah)
October 6, 2022 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Victor Fuentes on 10/01/22, filed by Broadcast Music Inc. (Menold, Noah)
October 6, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Victor Fuentes answer due 10/27/2022. (DS)
September 13, 2022 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION ON APPEAL REGARDING A COPYRIGHT. (Copy mailed to Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office, Library of Congress, Washington, DC 20559.) (Attachments: #1 Song List)(TC)
September 13, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Mailed to Plaintiffs for service.) (TC)
September 13, 2022 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by 3Ring Circus Music LLC dba Soulride Music, BMG Rights Management (US) LLC dba BMG Bumblebee, Broadcast Music Inc, Cackalacki Twang, Carnival Music Company dba Tiltawhirl Music, Combine Music Corp, Eleksylum Music Inc, Get Loose Music Inc, Kings Road Music, No Surrender Music a division of Praxis International Communications Inc, Orbi-Lee Publishing, Painted Desert Music Corporation, Pink Dog Publishing, R-Key Darkus Publishing, Robert Cray Music Inc, Round Hill Music LP dba Round Hill Works, Roys Boys LLC, Songs of Universal Inc, Sony/ATV Songs LLC dba Sony/ATV Acuff Rose Music, Sony/ATV Songs LLC dba Sony/ATV Tree Publishing, Stone Diamond Music Corp, Warner Tamerlane Publishing Corp, Windswept Holdings LLC dba Songs of Windswept Pacific. (TC)
September 13, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402), filed by BMG Rights Management (US) LLC dba BMG Bumblebee, Sony/ATV Songs LLC dba Sony/ATV Tree Publishing, Orbi-Lee Publishing, Songs of Universal Inc, Cackalacki Twang, Carnival Music Company dba Tiltawhirl Music, Broadcast Music Inc, Warner Tamerlane Publishing Corp, Round Hill Music LP dba Round Hill Works, Robert Cray Music Inc, Pink Dog Publishing, R-Key Darkus Publishing, Get Loose Music Inc, Stone Diamond Music Corp, Windswept Holdings LLC dba Songs of Windswept Pacific, 3Ring Circus Music LLC dba Soulride Music, No Surrender Music a division of Praxis International Communications Inc, Painted Desert Music Corporation, Roys Boys LLC, Kings Road Music, Eleksylum Music Inc, Combine Music Corp, Sony/ATV Songs LLC dba Sony/ATV Acuff Rose Music. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Song List, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(TC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music et al v. Pink Pig et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music Inc
Represented By: Noah Allen Menold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Songs of Universal Inc
Represented By: Noah Allen Menold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Get Loose Music Inc
Represented By: Noah Allen Menold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kings Road Music
Represented By: Noah Allen Menold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony ATV Songs LLC doing business as Sony ATV Acuff Rose Music
Represented By: Noah Allen Menold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R-Key Darkus Publishing
Represented By: Noah Allen Menold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orbi-Lee Publishing
Represented By: Noah Allen Menold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roys Boys LLC
Represented By: Noah Allen Menold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stone Diamond Music Corp
Represented By: Noah Allen Menold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Combine Music Corp
Represented By: Noah Allen Menold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BMG Rights Management (US) LLC doing business as BMG Bumblebee
Represented By: Noah Allen Menold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Windswept Holdings LLC doing business as Songs of Windswept Pacific
Represented By: Noah Allen Menold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Cray Music Inc
Represented By: Noah Allen Menold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Painted Desert Music Corporation
Represented By: Noah Allen Menold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 3Ring Circus Music LLC doing business as Soulride Music
Represented By: Noah Allen Menold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Round Hill Music LP doing business as Round Hill Works
Represented By: Noah Allen Menold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cackalacki Twang
Represented By: Noah Allen Menold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warner Tamerlane Publishing Corp
Represented By: Noah Allen Menold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eleksylum Music Inc
Represented By: Noah Allen Menold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: No Surrender Music
Represented By: Noah Allen Menold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony ATV Songs LLC doing business as Sony ATV Tree Publishing
Represented By: Noah Allen Menold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carnival Music Company doing business as Tiltawhirl Music
Represented By: Noah Allen Menold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pink Dog Publishing
Represented By: Noah Allen Menold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pink Pig Inc doing business as The Pink Pig
Represented By: Joseph D Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Fuentes
Represented By: Joseph D Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Traci Lipps
Represented By: Joseph D Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?