Kruse v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Brian Kruse
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security - Office of the General Counsel
Case Number: 1:2023cv01159
Filed: April 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Referring Judge: Michael M Mihm
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER regarding Consent to Magistrate Judge. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 6/15/23. (Attachments: #1 Consent Packet)(WG)
June 14, 2023 Filing 7 SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT. Plaintiff Brief due by 7/14/2023. (Attachments: #1 Transcript)(Patel, Hinal)
June 14, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE OF CAR IN LIEU OF ANSWER (Patel, Hinal)
June 14, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Hinal A Patel on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Patel, Hinal)
April 21, 2023 NOTICE of Social Security Complaint filed. Commissioner of Social Security answer due on 6/20/2023. (TK)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 4/21/2023 GRANTING #3 the Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. The Plaintiff's Application was submitted under penalty of perjury and sufficiently demonstrates that the Plaintiff should be excused from paying the filing fee in this action. (KZ)
April 20, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Adriana M de la Torre on behalf of Brian Kruse (de la Torre, Adriana)
April 20, 2023 Filing 3 PETITION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Brian Kruse. Responses due by 5/4/2023 (de la Torre, Adriana)
April 20, 2023 Filing 2 +++ SEALED DOCUMENT.. (de la Torre, Adriana)
April 20, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Seeking Judicial Review against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Brian Kruse. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(de la Torre, Adriana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kruse v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Kruse
Represented By: Adriana M de la Torre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Hinal A Patel
Represented By: US ATTY-PEORIA SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security - Office of the General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?