Discounted Water Filters, Inc. v. A.O. Smith Water Treatment (North America), Inc.
Plaintiff: Discounted Water Filters, Inc.
Defendant: A.O. Smith Water Treatment (North America), Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv01416
Filed: November 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Referring Judge: Michael M Mihm
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 1, 2024 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #13 Consented Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to, or Motion to dismiss, Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Defendant A.O. Smith Water Treatment (North America), Inc. shall file their responsive pleading by 1/12/2024. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 1/1/2024. (WG)
December 27, 2023 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #11 Amended Complaint, or to File Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Defendant A.O. Smith Water Treatment (North America), Inc.. Responses due by 1/10/2024 (Agnello, Thomas)
December 22, 2023 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Plaintiff Discounted Water Filters, Inc.. (Bathke, John)
December 22, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: In light of the Plaintiff filing its First Amended Complaint #11 as of right, the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction #7 is now MOOT. The Defendant must respond to the First Amended Complaint in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(3). See Civil LR 7.1(E). Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 12/22/2023. (KZ)
December 21, 2023 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against A.O. Smith Water Treatment (North America), Inc., filed by Discounted Water Filters, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Bathke, John)
December 15, 2023 Reset Deadline as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Responses due by 12/22/2023. (JS)
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 12/14/2023. Finding good cause shown, the Court GRANTS #10 Consented Motion for Plaintiff's Extension of Time to File Response and for Defendant's Extension of Time to File Reply. Plaintiff has up to and including December 22, 2023, to file its response. Likewise, Defendant's deadline to file a reply, if any, is extended up to and including January 12, 2024. (AEM)
December 13, 2023 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction on or before December 22, 2023 and for Defendant until January 12, 2024 to seek leave to file and file any permitted reply by Plaintiff Discounted Water Filters, Inc.. Responses due by 12/27/2023 (Phillips, Jonathan)
December 1, 2023 Filing 9 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by A.O. Smith Water Treatment (North America), Inc.. (Agnello, Thomas)
December 1, 2023 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM of Law re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by A.O. Smith Water Treatment (North America), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - June 16, 2009 Letter, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Wendy Grant, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Thomas A. Agnello)(Agnello, Thomas)
December 1, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant A.O. Smith Water Treatment (North America), Inc.. Responses due by 12/15/2023 (Agnello, Thomas)
December 1, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by John T.D. Bathke on behalf of Discounted Water Filters, Inc. (Bathke, John)
December 1, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Thomas Agnello on behalf of A.O. Smith Water Treatment (North America), Inc. (Agnello, Thomas)
November 13, 2023 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Summons served on Documents Specialist at Corporation Service Company on 11/10/2023, filed by Discounted Water Filters, Inc.., SUMMONS Returned Executed by Discounted Water Filters, Inc.. A.O. Smith Water Treatment (North America), Inc. served on 11/10/2023, answer due 12/1/2023. (Phillips, Jonathan)
November 9, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to A.O. Smith Water Treatment (North America), Inc. (AEM)
November 9, 2023 Filing 2 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Discounted Water Filters, Inc.. (Phillips, Jonathan)
November 9, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against A.O. Smith Water Treatment (North America), Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILCDC-4338356.), filed by Discounted Water Filters, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Correspondence from Defendant's counsel, #2 Exhibit 2 - Correspondence from Defendant's counsel, #3 Exhibit 3 - Correspondence from Defendant's counsel, #4 Exhibit 4 - Correspondence from Plaintiff's counsel, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons for Issuance)(Phillips, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Discounted Water Filters, Inc. v. A.O. Smith Water Treatment (North America), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Discounted Water Filters, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan LA Phillips
Represented By: John T.D. Bathke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.O. Smith Water Treatment (North America), Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Agnello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?